The Assistant Directors of the Institute | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2012-08-14 | 2016-06-30 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2009-08-14 | 2012-08-13 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2006-08-14 | 2009-08-13 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2003-03-01 | 2009-10-04 | | | 2009-10-05 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2005-06-13 | 2006-06-03 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-02-28 | | | 2013-03-28 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2012-11-01 | 2016-06-30 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2009-11-01 | 2012-10-31 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2006-11-01 | 2009-10-31 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Dr Whitby Dennis George | 2002-07-01 | 2005-11-21 | | Mr Cinnamond Stanley Thomas | 2002-07-01 | 2013-03-31 | | |
|
The Director of the Institute (Chairman) | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 2011-07-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2010-01-28 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2007-01-28 | 2010-01-27 | | | 2004-01-28 | 2007-01-27 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-09-15 | | Professor Auld Christopher John | 2013-04-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
|
The Director of the Institute of Human Performance | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 2011-07-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2010-01-28 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2007-01-28 | 2010-01-27 | | | 2004-01-28 | 2007-01-27 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-09-15 | | Professor Auld Christopher John | 2013-04-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
|
A member of the Staff Sports Club, nominated by the Committee of Management and appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | Senate | 2013-05-01 | 2014-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2011-05-01 | 2013-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2009-05-01 | 2011-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2007-05-01 | 2009-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2005-05-01 | 2007-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2003-05-17 | 2005-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2014-10-31 | 2015-06-30 | | |
|
A postgraduate student, on the recommendation of the Executive Committee of the Postgraduate Students' Association, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | Senate | 2007-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | Dr Ba Qing |
|
A member of the Senior Management Team, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | President and Vice-Chancellor | |
Two community representatives, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | Senate | 2014-10-31 | 2015-06-30 | | Dr Ng Ada Tsui Lin |
|
Two University representatives external to the Institute, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | Senate | 2005-07-26 | 2007-04-30 | | | 2003-05-17 | 2005-04-30 | | | 2007-05-01 | 2009-04-30 | | | 2005-07-26 | 2007-04-30 | | | 2013-05-01 | 2014-04-30 | | | 2011-05-01 | 2013-04-30 | | | 2009-06-25 | 2011-04-30 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2010-12-29 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2009-06-25 | 2010-07-03 | | | 2014-10-31 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2003-05-17 | 2005-04-30 | | |
|
The Secretary | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | | 2007-11-05 | 2016-06-30 | | Mr Lai Chak Kong | 2003-03-06 | 2007-01-09 | | Mr Lai Chak Kong | 2007-01-10 | 2007-11-04 | | Ms Yu Lisa Wei Man |
|
The Assistant Directors of the Institute of Human Performance | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | | 2012-08-14 | 2016-06-30 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2009-08-14 | 2012-08-13 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2006-08-14 | 2009-08-13 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2006-06-05 | 2009-10-04 | | | 2003-03-01 | 2005-06-12 | | | 2009-10-05 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2005-06-13 | 2006-06-03 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-02-28 | | | 2013-03-28 | 2014-05-30 | | | 2012-11-01 | 2016-06-30 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2009-11-01 | 2012-10-31 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2006-11-01 | 2009-10-31 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Dr Whitby Dennis George | 2002-07-01 | 2007-11-21 | | Mr Cinnamond Stanley Thomas | 2002-07-01 | 2013-03-31 | | |
|
The Dean of Student Affairs | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | | 2013-04-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2008-04-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2005-04-01 | 2008-03-31 | | | 2016-01-01 | 2016-06-30 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2003-12-01 | 2004-10-17 | | Dr Powell Ellis John | 2002-07-01 | 2003-11-30 | | Dr Powell Ellis John | 2004-10-18 | 2005-03-31 | | |
|
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2005-01-31 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-12-19 | | | 2002-11-15 | 2003-12-19 | | |
|
Secretary | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | | | 1994-11-14 | | Mr Lee Dominic Yeung Fan | 1994-11-15 | 1998-12-31 | | Mrs Tsang Amy Wai Chee |
|
One Fellow of the Institute, nominated by the Fellows, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | Senate | | 1996-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
|
The Deputy Director of the Institute or, failing the establishment of the post, one of the Principal Investigators of the Institute, nominated by the Director, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | Senate | | 1993-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Tai Kwong | 1995-08-01 | 1998-12-03 | | |
|
One teacher, nominated by the Dean of Science, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | Senate | | 1996-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
Director of the Institute | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | | 1990-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Kan Yuet Wai | 1998-12-04 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Kung Hsiang-fu |
|
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | | 1997-03-31 | | | 1998-01-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1997-04-01 | 1997-12-31 | | |
|
Two teachers from those disciplines in the University related most closely to the work of the Institute, appointed by the Senate | Institute of Molecular Biology Committee of Management | Senate | | 1996-06-30 | | | | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | |
|