Director of the Institute | Institute of Molecular Biology Supervisory Board | | 1990-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Kan Yuet Wai | 2003-12-04 | 2004-12-03 | | Professor Kung Hsiang-fu | 1998-12-04 | 2003-12-03 | | Professor Kung Hsiang-fu |
|
Up to six teachers, at least two of whom shall be Senate members, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time. (Members shall come from different disciplines and shall preferably have knowledge of education systems in different geographical regions.) | International Collaboration, Committee on | Senate | | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Frankenstein John | 1995-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Dr Frankenstein John | | 1995-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Chwang Allen Tse Yung | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Chwang Allen Tse Yung | 1995-07-01 | 1996-12-16 | | Professor Joseph John Earl | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Lee Ngok | 1997-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Ng Sek Hong | 1997-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | | | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Will Barry Fegan | 1995-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Will Barry Fegan |
|
Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
A Vice-Chairman, the Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Academic) | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1993-06-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|
A lay member of the Council, appointed by the Council | International Collaboration, Committee on | Council | | 1995-05-12 | | The Hon. Mr. Justice Litton Henry |
|
Officers in Attendance | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1992-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Mr Chan Rupert Kwan Yun | 1992-07-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun |
|
Secretary | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1993-09-01 | 1995-04-30 | | Mrs Kwan Julita Yuk Kwan | 1995-05-01 | 1996-01-23 | | Ms Tang Violet Wai Chu | 1996-01-24 | 1998-08-17 | | Ms Yu Lisa Wei Man |
|
One member of the University Research Committee appointed by the Committee | International Collaboration, Committee on | University Research Committee | | 1994-06-30 | | | 1995-05-10 | 1998-12-31 | | Professor Tong David Shuk Yin |
|
One member of the University Research Committee appointed by the Committee | International Collaboration, Committee on | Council | |
Dean of Students | International Collaboration, Committee on | | 1999-01-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-10-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-07-01 | 1997-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Brandon William Peter John |
|
The Chairmen of any sub-committees | International Collaboration, Committee on | University Research Committee | |
Secretary | Investments Sub-Committee | | 2004-03-09 | 2012-06-30 | | Mr Lam Philip Bing Lun | 2021-09-15 | | | Mr Lo Tung Sing Tony | 2012-07-01 | 2021-09-14 | | Ms Lo Sau Mui |
|
The President and Vice-Chancellor, or his representative | Investments Sub-Committee | | 2019-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | | 2022-07-01 | | | | 2004-03-08 | 2005-09-11 | | | 2009-09-01 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2005-09-12 | 2009-08-31 | | |
|
The Director of the Centre (ex-officio) | Jockey Club Magnetic Resonance Imaging Centre, Committee of Management of the | | 2005-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2003-02-05 | 2005-06-30 | | |
|
3 specialists in relevant fields, nominated by the Committee of Management and appointed by the Senate for a period of 3 years | Jockey Club Magnetic Resonance Imaging Centre, Committee of Management of the | Senate | 2006-10-01 | 2007-11-21 | | | 2004-01-07 | 2006-09-30 | | |
|
A Chairman, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor for a period of 3 years | Jockey Club Magnetic Resonance Imaging Centre, Committee of Management of the | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2006-05-01 | 2007-11-21 | | | 2003-04-14 | 2006-04-30 | | |
|
The Dean of Medicine or his representative (ex-officio) | Jockey Club Magnetic Resonance Imaging Centre, Committee of Management of the | | 2007-03-12 | 2007-11-21 | | | 2003-09-01 | 2007-03-20 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2003-02-05 | 2003-08-31 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
|
The Dean of Engineering or his representative (ex-officio) | Jockey Club Magnetic Resonance Imaging Centre, Committee of Management of the | | 2003-02-05 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2007-05-27 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2007-05-28 | 2007-11-21 | | |
|
The Secretary | Jockey Club Magnetic Resonance Imaging Centre, Committee of Management of the | | 2003-02-05 | 2005-09-19 | | Mrs Tsang Tse Angela Oi Man | 2005-09-20 | 2007-11-21 | | Ms Lin Wendy Yau Lan |
|
Secretary | Joint Consultative Committee of HKU-SPACE and Faculties | | 2005-01-10 | | | Dr Cribbin John Antony |
|