The officer-in-charge, Medical Illustration Unit | Media Resources, Committee on | | |
Director, SPMET or his/her nominee | Media Resources, Committee on | | 1993-10-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan |
|
A member of the Senate, appointed by the Council | Mrs Li Ka Shing Fund Committee of Management | Council | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1992-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun |
|
Secretary | Mrs Li Ka Shing Fund Committee of Management | | 2005-08-12 | | | Ms Tsui Bernadette Wing Suen | 2004-08-09 | 2005-08-11 | | Ms Yeung Portia Yuet Ping | 1994-09-15 | 2004-08-07 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man |
|
A teacher of the University, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor | Mrs Li Ka Shing Fund Committee of Management | | |
Co-Opted | Mrs Li Ka Shing Fund Committee of Management | | 2006-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | | | 2004-08-09 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2008-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | |
|
A member of the Senior Management Team, appointed by the President & Vice-Chancellor | Mrs Li Ka Shing Fund Committee of Management | | 2015-03-01 | 2017-06-30 | | Mr So Douglas Cheung Tak |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor, or his nominee (Chairman) | Mrs Li Ka Shing Fund Committee of Management | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1995-01-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | 2023-07-14 | | |
|
A teacher of the University, appointed by the President and Vice-Chancellor | Mrs Li Ka Shing Fund Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2012-07-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2004-08-09 | 2006-08-31 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Nominations Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
Secretary (The Registrar) | Nominations Committee | | 2004-01-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2020-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man | 2024-07-01 | | | |
|
One University staff member of the Council (save the President & Vice-Chancellor who is already a member of the Committee), elected by staff and student members of the Council for a period of 2 years | Nominations Committee | Council | 2009-01-01 | 2009-12-04 | | | 2007-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2018-10-03 | 2018-11-19 | | | 2022-12-28 | | | | 2020-12-28 | 2022-12-27 | | | 2018-12-28 | 2020-12-27 | | | 2016-01-27 | 2017-09-28 | | | 2017-09-29 | 2018-08-19 | | | 2011-12-23 | 2012-12-08 | | | 2009-12-23 | 2011-12-22 | | | 2005-12-18 | 2006-12-31 | | | 2003-12-18 | 2005-12-17 | | | 2015-01-30 | 2015-11-19 | | | 2013-01-30 | 2015-01-29 | | |
|
Six teachers from Faculties other than the Faculty of Arts, appointed by the Senate. | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | Senate | 1996-07-01 | 1997-12-31 | | Dr Greene George William | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Greene George William | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Mr Chiu Edward Kai Chiu | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Chiu Edward Kai Chiu | 1996-07-01 | 1997-01-05 | | Mr Rhodes Peter Frederick | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Rhodes Peter Frederick | 1997-01-06 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Chan Kai Yuen | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Chan Kai Yuen | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1994-03-03 | 1996-06-30 | | |
|
The Dean of the Faculty of Arts or a representative appointed by the Dean | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1994-04-24 | 1996-06-30 | | |
|
The Director of the School of Research Studies or a representative appointed by the Director | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1997-05-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1996-01-01 | 1997-03-31 | | Professor Weatherhead Brian |
|
Four members from each of the language groups of Chinese, Japanese, Germanic and Romance languages | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1994-05-16 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1994-06-01 | 1997-05-31 | | Dr Meyer Denis Charles | 1994-05-16 | 1998-12-31 | | | 1994-06-01 | 1997-05-31 | | Mr Urbanski Paul Heinz |
|
A teacher appointed by the Senate (Chairman) | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | Senate | 1994-04-06 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Fletcher Paul Jeffrey |
|
Secretary | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1993-12-14 | 1995-01-15 | | Mrs Kwan Julita Yuk Kwan | 1998-07-06 | 1998-12-31 | | Mrs Tsang Renee Kwai Ling | 1995-01-16 | 1998-07-05 | | Ms Tang Violet Wai Chu |
|
The Head of each teaching department and unit offering non-degree language courses (other than English enhancement and courses offered in the SPACE) | Non-degree Language Teaching, Board of Studies for | | 1997-01-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1994-05-16 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1995-09-15 | 1996-12-31 | | | 1994-05-16 | 1995-09-14 | | Professor Moeran Brian Dermot | 1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Refsing Kirsten | 1998-09-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|
Librarian | Pauline Chan Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | | | 1997-03-31 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1997-04-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing |
|