A further Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | Technology Support Centre, Committee of Management of the | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2004-02-25 | 2008-07-31 | | | 2009-05-01 | 2010-10-21 | | | 2008-08-01 | 2009-04-30 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2010-10-22 | 2012-08-31 | | |
|
A member who is not a user of the Technology Support Centre services, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | Technology Support Centre, Committee of Management of the | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2013-05-05 | 2014-05-15 | | | 2010-05-05 | 2013-05-04 | | | 2007-05-05 | 2010-05-04 | | | 2004-05-05 | 2007-05-04 | | |
|
2 members who are users of the Technology Support Centre services, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | Technology Support Centre, Committee of Management of the | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2013-05-05 | 2014-05-15 | | | 2010-05-05 | 2013-05-04 | | | 2007-05-05 | 2010-05-04 | | | 2004-05-05 | 2007-05-04 | | | 2007-05-05 | 2010-05-04 | | | 2004-05-05 | 2007-05-04 | | | 2013-05-05 | 2014-05-15 | | | 2010-05-05 | 2013-05-04 | | |
|
Dean of Engineering, or his/her representative | Technology Support Centre, Committee of Management of the | | 2004-05-12 | 2007-05-27 | | | 2007-05-28 | 2011-08-15 | | | 2011-08-16 | 2012-06-11 | | | 2012-06-12 | 2014-05-15 | | |
|
Two teachers of the University, appointed by the Finance Committee (Chairperson) | Tenders Board | Finance Committee | 2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2011-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 2004-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 2022-01-01 | | | | 2017-07-01 | 2020-01-31 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | | 2020-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2017-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | |
|
Two Teachers of the University, appointed by the Finance Committee (Chairperson) | Tenders Board | Council | 1994-12-01 | 1995-11-30 | | | 1989-12-01 | 1994-11-30 | | |
|
The Director of Finance or his/her rep. | Tenders Board | | 2015-09-10 | 2018-11-30 | | Mr Hui Antony Tak Fai | 1990-04-17 | 2012-06-30 | | Mr Lam Philip Bing Lun | 2014-07-01 | 2014-08-19 | | Mr Li Edmund Tak Man | 2021-09-15 | | | Mr Lo Tung Sing Tony | 2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | Mr Ng Hoi Luk | 2018-12-01 | 2020-05-30 | | Ms Lam Sau Wai Sylvia | 2020-06-01 | 2021-09-14 | | Ms Lo Sau Mui |
|
The Director of Estates or his/her rep. | Tenders Board | | 1998-07-11 | 1998-07-12 | | Mr McGraw Malcolm | 2023-03-01 | 2024-09-16 | | Mr Sy Wai Yin | 2020-07-01 | 2023-02-28 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2017-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2013-08-01 | 2017-06-30 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2013-07-01 | 2013-07-31 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2000-03-01 | 2013-06-30 | | Mr Wong Kenneth Pak Keung | 1998-07-13 | 2000-02-29 | | Mr Wong Kenneth Pak Keung |
|
Secretary | Tenders Board | | 2014-08-20 | 2015-09-09 | | Miss Cheung Teresa Hoi Ling | 1994-01-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Mr Chang Yee Chun | 2015-09-10 | 2018-11-30 | | Mr Hui Antony Tak Fai | 2014-07-01 | 2014-08-19 | | Mr Li Edmund Tak Man | 2021-09-15 | | | Mr Lo Tung Sing Tony | 1996-01-01 | 2014-06-30 | | Mr Ng Hoi Luk | 2018-12-01 | 2020-05-31 | | Ms Lam Sau Wai Sylvia | 2020-06-01 | 2021-09-14 | | Ms Lo Sau Mui |
|
Two teachers of the University, appointed by the Finance Committee (Chairperson) | Tenders Board | Council | 1992-07-01 | 1993-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren | 1998-12-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-12-01 | 1998-11-30 | | | 1995-12-01 | 1996-11-30 | | | 1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 1996-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 1995-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung | 1993-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung |
|
At least one academic/practicing or retired professional/retired civil servant, appointed by the Finance Committee | Tenders Board | | 2024-07-01 | | | | 2018-12-01 | 2020-01-31 | | | 2016-12-01 | 2018-11-30 | | | 2015-12-01 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2015-11-30 | | | 2009-12-01 | 2012-11-30 | | |
|
At least one academic/practicing or retired professional/retired civil servant, appointed by the Finance Committee | Tenders Board | Finance Committee | |
Two teachers of the University, appointed by the Finance Committee (Deputy Chairperson) | Tenders Board | Finance Committee | 2022-01-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2021-07-01 | 2021-12-31 | | | 2020-02-01 | 2021-07-31 | | |
|
Two teachers of the University, appointed by the Finance Committee (Chairperson) | Tenders Board | | |
The Vice-Chancellor (statutory) | The Kadoorie Institute Committee of Management | | 2012-09-01 | 2012-09-05 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | |
|
Secretary | The Kadoorie Institute Committee of Management | | 2009-01-13 | 2012-09-05 | | Miss Ngai Yuen See |
|
Up to 2 members co-opted by the Committee | The Kadoorie Institute Committee of Management | | 2012-01-01 | 2012-09-05 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2011-12-31 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2012-09-05 | | | 2011-05-01 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2009-05-01 | 2011-04-30 | | | 2010-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | |
|
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | The Kadoorie Institute Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | |
A Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | The Kadoorie Institute Committee of Management | | 2012-09-01 | 2012-09-05 | | | 2009-03-01 | 2012-08-31 | | |
|
Three teachers appointed by the Senate, at least one of whom shall be a Fellow of the Institute | The Kadoorie Institute Committee of Management | | 2009-02-17 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2012-09-05 | | | 2009-02-17 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2012-09-05 | | | 2009-02-17 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2012-09-05 | | |
|