(f) The BA&BEd(LangEd) Co-ordinator (Arts-Chinese) | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | | 2012-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2018-07-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
|
(e) The BA&BEd(LangEd) Co-ordinator (Education-English) | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | | 2012-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2023-09-01 | 2024-08-31 | | Dr Yang Chi Cheung Ruby | 2018-07-01 | 2019-08-31 | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling | 2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
(c) The Professional Core Co-ordinator | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | | 2015-07-01 | 2015-08-16 | | Dr Chu Wei Ling Chloe | 2012-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | Dr Chu Wei Ling Chloe | 2015-08-17 | 2015-12-05 | | Miss Lau Kwok Ling | 2023-09-01 | | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling | 2019-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling | 2016-10-17 | 2017-08-31 | | Ms Lai Man Yung Wendy | 2017-09-01 | 2019-08-14 | | | 2015-12-06 | 2016-10-16 | | |
|
(e) A representative from the Linguistics discipline of the School of Humanities | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | | 2016-07-25 | 2019-07-24 | | | 2013-07-25 | 2016-07-24 | | | 2007-07-25 | 2013-07-24 | | |
|
Chairperson [BA&BEd(LangEd) Programme Director] | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | Senate | 2007-09-25 | 2008-12-31 | | Dr Bunton David Rowland |
|
Chairperson | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2018-08-15 | 2019-08-14 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2018-08-14 | | | 2014-12-23 | 2017-03-31 | | |
|
Secretary | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | | 2012-09-20 | | | Miss Cheung Mei Kuen Miranda | 2008-10-06 | 2012-09-19 | | Ms Wong Alien Yue Wing | 2007-09-25 | 2008-10-05 | | Ms Wong Jennifer See Ming |
|
(d) The BA&BEd(LangEd) Co-ordinator (Education-Chinese) | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | Senate | |
Chairperson | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | Senate | |
(b) The BA&BEd(LangEd) Programme Director or his/her representative | BoS in Bachelor of Arts and Bachelor of Education in Language Education | Senate | |
(d) The Professional Core (Science Education) Coordinator | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2012-12-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2021-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling | 2018-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling | 2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | Mrs Chan Pun Kit Ling |
|
(b) 3 representatives from Departments and Schools as determined by the Faculty of Science | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2015-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2021-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2018-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2018-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2016-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2021-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2019-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2021-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Professor Tong Pui Ling | 2018-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | Professor Tong Pui Ling | 2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | Professor Tong Pui Ling | 2012-12-01 | 2015-06-30 | | Professor Tong Pui Ling |
|
From the Faculty of Science: (a) An Associate Dean or his/her representative | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2012-12-01 | 2013-01-31 | | | 2014-09-01 | 2016-11-30 | | | 2013-02-01 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2021-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2020-01-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
|
Chairperson | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2012-12-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
(c) The BEd&BSc Coordinator | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2015-08-01 | 2016-08-30 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2016-09-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
(b) The BEd&BSc Programme Director or his/her representative | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2014-04-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2018-08-15 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2018-08-14 | | |
|
Secretary | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2017-12-11 | 2018-02-21 | | Miss Chan Hiu Wah | 2012-12-01 | 2014-02-07 | | Miss Lee Ka Wai | 2014-02-08 | 2017-12-10 | | Miss Lee Tsui Ying Anna | 2018-02-22 | | | Ms Chow Yee Ling |
|
From the Faculty of Education: (a) An Associate Dean or his/her representative | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2019-09-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2015-05-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2015-04-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2013-08-31 | | | 2021-01-01 | 2022-10-31 | | |
|
From the Faculty of Science: (a) An Associate Dean or his/her representative | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | Senate | |
(b) The BEd&BSc Programme Director or his/her representative | BoS in Bachelor of Education and Bachelor of Science | | 2014-04-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2019-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2018-08-15 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2017-09-01 | 2018-08-14 | | |
|