The Director of University Health Service (ex-officio) | Health, Safety and Well-Being, Committee on | | 2020-12-05 | | | Dr Cheung Man Kuen | 2017-06-28 | 2020-12-04 | | Dr Cheung Man Kuen |
|
A member of the Senior Management Team, appointed by the President & Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Health, Safety and Well-Being, Committee on | | 2017-06-28 | 2019-09-30 | | | 2020-08-17 | 2022-04-30 | | Mr Lo Chit Ki Steve | 2022-12-15 | 2024-01-19 | | | 2024-01-20 | | | | 2019-10-01 | 2020-08-16 | | |
|
One member each from the Academic Staff Association, the University of Hong Kong Staff Association, the University of Hong Kong Employees Union, nominated by the respective staff associations and appointed by the Council | Health, Safety and Well-Being, Committee on | | 2018-03-28 | 2018-12-27 | | | 2019-09-25 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2018-01-31 | 2021-01-30 | | Mr Cheung Pok Yin | 2021-01-31 | 2024-01-30 | | Ms Poon Po Wah Rebecca | 2018-01-31 | 2021-01-30 | | Ms Poon Po Wah Rebecca |
|
Officers in Attendance | Health, Safety and Well-Being, Committee on | | 2017-06-28 | 2020-08-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2021-09-15 | | | Mr Lo Tung Sing Tony | 2017-06-28 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2017-06-28 | 2021-09-14 | | Ms Lo Sau Mui | 2020-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man | 2024-07-01 | | | | 2020-09-01 | | | |
|
Three members of the Faculty (one of whom shall preferably be a Dean or a Head of Department and one of whom from a Clinical Department in the Faculty of Medicine or the Faculty of Dentistry), appointed by Senate | Health, Safety and Well-Being, Committee on | Senate | 2018-03-06 | 2018-06-30 | | | 2021-04-22 | 2023-06-30 | | | 2018-03-06 | 2021-03-05 | | | 2023-10-31 | | | | 2021-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2018-07-11 | 2021-06-30 | | | 2021-03-06 | 2024-03-05 | | | 2018-03-06 | 2021-03-05 | | |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Social Sciences Faculty Board | |
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | | 1996-11-07 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Kay James Neil | | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Clark Robert Kingsley Francis |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Higher Degrees, Committee on | | 1996-03-14 | 1998-10-05 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Medicine Faculty Board | 1993-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Yeung Desmond Chak Yew |
|
The Director of the School of Research Studies | Higher Degrees, Committee on | | 1997-05-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1996-04-01 | 1997-03-31 | | Professor Weatherhead Brian | 1993-04-01 | 1996-03-31 | | Professor Weatherhead Brian |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Dentistry Faculty Board | |
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Education Faculty Board | 1994-09-01 | 1996-08-31 | | Professor Johnson Robert Keith |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Arts Faculty Board | |
The Chairman and Vice-Chairman (at least one of whom shall be a Senate member) appointed by the Senate from among teachers for two years at a time | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Senate | 1985-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Cooke Brian Lawrence | 1995-07-01 | 1998-10-05 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam | 1995-07-01 | 1998-10-05 | | Emeritus Professor Moore Francis Charles Timothy |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Engineering Faculty Board | 1994-08-24 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Chan Francis Huo Yen |
|
Secretary | Higher Degrees, Committee on | | | 1996-12-31 | | Dr Huey Herbert Man Chiu | 1997-01-01 | 1998-10-01 | | Mrs Ma Leung Wendy Oi Ling |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Law Faculty Board | 1995-12-11 | 1998-06-30 | | Ms Sihombing Judith Elizabeth | 1993-09-01 | 1995-12-10 | | Professor Booth Charles David |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Science Faculty Board | 1994-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai |
|
The Chairman of each Faculty Higher Degrees Committee, and the Chairman of the Higher Degrees Committee of the School of Business | Higher Degrees, Committee on | Architecture Faculty Board | |
The Chairman (The Chairman and Vice-Chairman (members of the Senate appointed for two years at a time)) | Higher Doctorates, Committee on | Senate | 2019-12-13 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2017-12-13 | 2019-12-12 | | | 2016-05-04 | 2017-12-12 | | | 2014-12-13 | 2015-12-12 | | | 2012-12-13 | 2014-12-12 | | | 2012-01-26 | 2012-12-12 | | | 2010-02-11 | 2012-01-25 | | | 2009-03-01 | 2009-11-27 | | | 2007-02-27 | 2009-02-28 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2006-11-27 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan | 1999-12-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan | 1995-07-01 | 1999-11-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan | 1989-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ma Ho Kei | 1984-07-01 | 1985-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Sir Todd David | 1999-12-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Tideman Henk | 1995-07-01 | 1999-11-30 | | Emeritus Professor Tideman Henk | 2004-05-17 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2022-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | | 2020-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
|