Secretary | Hsu Long Sing Research Fund Committee of Management | | 1996-02-07 | 1998-12-31 | | Miss Leung Equeen Yee Kwan | 1994-09-15 | 1994-11-10 | | Mr Ng Eric Shu Pui | 1994-11-11 | 1996-02-06 | | Mrs Kwok Beckie Fung Yee |
|
A teacher who is not a member of the Department of Geography, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Hui Oi-Chow Trust Fund Committee of Management | Senate | 2006-09-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1985-06-29 | 1985-06-30 | | Professor Lee Ngok | 2016-05-01 | 2018-04-30 | | | 2014-05-01 | 2016-04-30 | | | 2012-05-01 | 2014-04-30 | | | 2010-05-18 | 2012-04-30 | | | 2007-09-04 | 2009-06-30 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Hui Oi-Chow Trust Fund Committee of Management | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | 2023-07-14 | | |
|
Two teachers from the Department of Geography, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Hui Oi-Chow Trust Fund Committee of Management | Head, Geog/Geol | 1993-12-16 | 1994-06-30 | | Dr Wang Liang Huew | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Ms Leung Wai Tung | 1992-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Sit Victor Fung Shuen | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Skeldon Ronald |
|
Head, Department of Geography (Chairman) | Hui Oi-Chow Trust Fund Committee of Management | | 2009-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2003-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2001-01-02 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1998-01-02 | 2001-01-01 | | | 2020-11-01 | 2021-06-30 | | | 1988-07-01 | 1993-12-02 | | Professor Leung Chi Keung | 2006-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 2017-11-01 | 2020-10-31 | | | 1996-12-03 | 1998-01-01 | | Professor Sit Victor Fung Shuen | 1993-12-03 | 1996-12-02 | | Professor Sit Victor Fung Shuen | 2017-01-01 | 2017-10-31 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | |
|
Two teachers from the Department of Geography, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Hui Oi-Chow Trust Fund Committee of Management | Senate | 2005-01-01 | 2006-12-31 | | Dr Kyle William John | 2003-01-01 | 2004-12-31 | | Dr Kyle William John | 2001-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | | Dr Kyle William John | 1998-11-18 | 2000-12-31 | | Dr Kyle William John | 2007-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2009-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2007-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2006-04-20 | 2006-12-31 | | | 2019-01-04 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2019-01-04 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2009-05-12 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2005-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2003-01-01 | 2004-12-31 | | | 2001-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 1998-11-18 | 2000-12-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Hui Oi-Chow Trust Fund Committee of Management | | 2007-06-07 | 2010-07-18 | | Miss Fung Fei Cheung | 2010-07-19 | | | Miss Hui Ying Ying Jaco | 1994-09-15 | 1994-11-10 | | Mr Ng Eric Shu Pui | 1996-06-24 | 2003-04-30 | | Mr Shen Edward D | 2003-05-01 | 2006-09-25 | | Mrs Kwok Beckie Fung Yee | 1994-11-11 | 1996-03-14 | | Mrs Kwok Beckie Fung Yee | 2006-09-26 | 2006-10-31 | | Ms Lui Katharine Mei Lan |
|
Two teachers from the Department of Geography, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Hui Oi-Chow Trust Fund Committee of Management | | 2017-01-01 | 2018-12-31 | | | 2017-01-01 | 2018-12-31 | | |
|
A teacher who is not a member of the Department of Geography, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Hui Oi-Chow Trust Fund Committee of Management | | |
Chairman [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Human Research Ethics Committee | Sub-committee | 2006-06-01 | 2007-01-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2017-02-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2016-02-01 | 2017-01-31 | | | 2015-02-01 | 2016-01-31 | | | 2013-02-01 | 2015-01-31 | | | 2011-02-01 | 2013-01-31 | | | 2009-02-01 | 2011-01-31 | | | 2007-02-01 | 2009-01-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Human Research Ethics Committee | | 2009-05-18 | 2012-12-26 | | Miss Liu Lai Ping | 2009-03-25 | 2009-05-17 | | Miss Ngai Yuen See | 2005-07-01 | 2008-11-16 | | Mrs Kwok Beckie Fung Yee | 2008-11-17 | 2009-03-16 | | Ms Tse Maggie Cheuk Yee | 2013-01-10 | | | Ms Yip Kate Kwai Kee |
|
1 member each from the Faculties of Arch, Arts, Bus&Econ, Dentistry, Edu, Engg, Law, Medicine, Sci and SocSc, who preferably are experienced in conducting research involving human subjects, appointed by the relevant Board of the Faculty | Human Research Ethics Committee | Sub-committee | 2006-06-01 | 2008-05-31 | | | 2008-06-01 | 2010-05-31 | | | 2006-06-01 | 2008-05-31 | | | 2008-06-01 | 2010-05-31 | | | 2006-06-01 | 2008-05-31 | | | 2008-12-03 | 2010-05-31 | | | 2008-06-01 | 2010-05-31 | | | 2006-06-01 | 2008-05-31 | | | 2008-06-01 | 2010-05-31 | | | 2006-06-01 | 2008-05-31 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad | 2006-06-01 | 2007-01-31 | | | 2008-06-01 | 2010-05-31 | | | 2007-02-01 | 2008-05-31 | | | 2008-06-01 | 2010-05-31 | | | 2006-06-01 | 2008-05-31 | | | 2008-06-01 | 2010-05-31 | | | 2008-06-01 | 2008-10-01 | | Professor Mason Mark Bernard | 2006-06-01 | 2008-05-31 | | Professor Mason Mark Bernard |
|
1 member each from the Faculties of Arch, Arts, Bus&Econ, Dentistry, Edu, Engg, Law, Medicine, Sci and SocSc, who preferably are experienced in conducting research involving human subjects, appointed by the relevant Board of the Faculty | Human Research Ethics Committee | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2011-03-17 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-01-20 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2011-03-17 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | Professor Mason Mark Bernard | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-01-20 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | |
|
Two Deputy Chairmen [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Human Research Ethics Committee | | 2016-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2011-03-17 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
Two Deputy Chairmen [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Human Research Ethics Committee | Sub-committee | 2017-01-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2017-01-01 | 2018-08-31 | | |
|
Chairman [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Human Research Ethics Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Human Resource Policy Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2004-02-25 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
1 academic member of the Council, appointed by the Council | Human Resource Policy Committee | Council | 2015-01-30 | 2015-12-08 | | | 2013-01-30 | 2015-01-29 | | | 2007-02-25 | 2009-12-04 | | | 2004-02-25 | 2007-02-24 | | | 2016-02-24 | 2018-11-19 | | | 2021-05-26 | 2024-05-25 | | | 2019-03-22 | 2021-04-17 | | | 2010-04-28 | 2012-12-08 | | |
|
The Secretary | Human Resource Policy Committee | | 2024-08-12 | | | Mr Choi Kar Chung | 2013-05-30 | 2014-01-09 | | Mrs Ching Rebecca Yuen Ling | 2011-01-01 | 2011-01-16 | | Mrs Ching Rebecca Yuen Ling | 2006-06-15 | 2010-12-31 | | Mrs Koo Lam Yvonne Yee Fung | 2011-01-17 | 2013-05-26 | | Mrs Lo Anna Wai Fun | 2004-02-25 | 2006-06-14 | | Ms Chung Judy Lai Chu | 2018-05-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Ho Yvonne | 2024-07-01 | 2024-08-11 | | Ms Kao Mei Yee Vicky | 2014-01-10 | 2018-04-30 | | Ms Wong Yuen Wah Jennie |
|
Secretary | Hung Hing Ying Physical Sciences Research Fund Committee of Management | | 1994-09-15 | 1994-11-10 | | Mr Ng Eric Shu Pui | 1996-06-24 | 1998-12-31 | | Mr Shen Edward D | 1994-11-11 | 1996-03-14 | | Mrs Kwok Beckie Fung Yee |
|