1 member each from the Faculties of Arch, Arts, Bus&Econ, Dentistry, Edu, Engg, Law, Medicine, Sci and SocSc, who preferably are experienced in conducting research involving human subjects, appointed by the relevant Board of the Faculty | Human Research Ethics Committee | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2011-03-17 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2010-06-01 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-01-20 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2011-03-17 | 2012-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2006-05-31 | | Professor Mason Mark Bernard | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-01-20 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2012-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | | 2018-06-01 | 2020-05-31 | | | 2016-06-01 | 2018-05-31 | | |
|
Two Deputy Chairmen [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Human Research Ethics Committee | | 2016-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2011-03-17 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
Two Deputy Chairmen [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Human Research Ethics Committee | Sub-committee | 2017-01-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2017-01-01 | 2018-08-31 | | |
|
Chairman [appointed by Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Research)] | Human Research Ethics Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-08-31 | | | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Human Resource Policy Committee | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2004-02-25 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
1 academic member of the Council, appointed by the Council | Human Resource Policy Committee | Council | 2015-01-30 | 2015-12-08 | | | 2013-01-30 | 2015-01-29 | | | 2007-02-25 | 2009-12-04 | | | 2004-02-25 | 2007-02-24 | | | 2016-02-24 | 2018-11-19 | | | 2021-05-26 | 2024-05-25 | | | 2019-03-22 | 2021-04-17 | | | 2010-04-28 | 2012-12-08 | | |
|
The Secretary | Human Resource Policy Committee | | 2024-08-12 | | | Mr Choi Kar Chung | 2013-05-30 | 2014-01-09 | | Mrs Ching Rebecca Yuen Ling | 2011-01-01 | 2011-01-16 | | Mrs Ching Rebecca Yuen Ling | 2006-06-15 | 2010-12-31 | | Mrs Koo Lam Yvonne Yee Fung | 2011-01-17 | 2013-05-26 | | Mrs Lo Anna Wai Fun | 2004-02-25 | 2006-06-14 | | Ms Chung Judy Lai Chu | 2018-05-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Ho Yvonne | 2024-07-01 | 2024-08-11 | | Ms Kao Mei Yee Vicky | 2014-01-10 | 2018-04-30 | | Ms Wong Yuen Wah Jennie |
|
Secretary | Hung Hing Ying Physical Sciences Research Fund Committee of Management | | 1994-09-15 | 1994-11-10 | | Mr Ng Eric Shu Pui | 1996-06-24 | 1998-12-31 | | Mr Shen Edward D | 1994-11-11 | 1996-03-14 | | Mrs Kwok Beckie Fung Yee |
|
The Deputy Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Hung Hing Ying Physical Sciences Research Fund Committee of Management | | 1996-05-20 | 1997-02-28 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1997-05-01 | 2000-04-30 | | | 1997-03-01 | 1997-04-30 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung |
|
A teacher appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Hung Hing Ying Physical Sciences Research Fund Committee of Management | Senate | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1990-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai |
|
One Pro-Vice-Chancellor, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | Hung Hing Ying Physical Sciences Research Fund Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | 1991-04-23 | 1996-05-19 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees |
|
Dean of Faculty of Science | Hung Hing Ying Physical Sciences Research Fund Committee of Management | | 1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1994-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1991-01-01 | 1993-12-31 | | Professor Hodgkiss Ivor John |
|
The Deputy Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Hung Hing Ying Physical Sciences Research Fund Committee of Management | Senate | | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Biscoe Timothy John |
|
Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Information & Public Relations, Committee on | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
Secretary | Information & Public Relations, Committee on | | | 1996-01-02 | | Mr Chan Rupert Kwan Yun |
|
Chairman, ASA | Information & Public Relations, Committee on | | | | | Mrs Stirling Gillian Margaret Grieve |
|
Dean of Students | Information & Public Relations, Committee on | | 1983-08-26 | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Brandon William Peter John |
|
Five Teachers | Information & Public Relations, Committee on | Council | |
The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Senate | 1991-07-01 | 1993-06-30 | | Dr Tao Louis Ping Kee |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Engineering Faculty Board | 2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1988-01-01 | 1994-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | |
|