Dean of Students | Information & Public Relations, Committee on | | 1983-08-26 | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Brandon William Peter John |
|
Five Teachers | Information & Public Relations, Committee on | Council | |
The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Senate | 1991-07-01 | 1993-06-30 | | Dr Tao Louis Ping Kee |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Engineering Faculty Board | 2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | 1988-01-01 | 1994-06-30 | | | 2012-07-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | |
|
The Director of Information Technology Services | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | 2015-05-01 | | | Dr Ho Pui Tak | 2007-07-01 | 2009-01-11 | | Dr Ho Pui Tak | 1990-12-01 | 2007-06-30 | | Dr Ng Nam | 2012-05-01 | 2015-04-30 | | Dr Tang Danny Wah Hau | 2012-01-12 | 2012-04-30 | | Mr Dengate Geoffrey Robert | 2009-01-12 | 2012-01-11 | | Mr Dengate Geoffrey Robert |
|
Three members from the non-Faculty units, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Senate | 2015-10-16 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2013-10-16 | 2015-10-15 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2011-02-15 | | | 2008-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2016-03-08 | 2017-12-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Dr Tam Lawrence Wai Hong | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr Tam Lawrence Wai Hong | 1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Dr Tam Lawrence Wai Hong | 1989-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Mr Costin Michael Jordan | 2015-10-16 | 2017-10-15 | | Mr Hui Antony Tak Fai | 2013-10-16 | 2015-10-15 | | Mr Hui Antony Tak Fai | 2015-10-16 | 2017-10-15 | | Mr Lai Chak Kong | 2013-10-16 | 2015-10-15 | | Mr Lai Chak Kong | 2011-02-16 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2010-09-01 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2008-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1988-01-01 | 1995-06-30 | | |
|
The Director of the School of Business, or his nominee | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | 1997-05-01 | 1999-04-30 | | | 1999-09-01 | 2000-12-31 | | |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Arts Faculty Board | 2003-10-16 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1999-12-01 | 2000-08-31 | | Dr Stanley Thomas Arthurs | 1995-12-01 | 1997-11-30 | | Dr Stanley Thomas Arthurs | 1988-01-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Mr Butler Malcolm | 2002-09-01 | 2003-10-15 | | | 2016-03-01 | 2018-02-28 | | | 2014-03-01 | 2016-02-29 | | | 2012-03-01 | 2014-02-28 | | | 2000-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | |
|
The Vice-Chairman (a teacher appointed by the Senate) | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Senate | 1998-09-01 | 2000-01-31 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1991-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Science Faculty Board | 2017-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2015-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | | 2013-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1999-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 1997-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1988-01-01 | 1993-06-30 | | Professor Chan Kai Yuen | 1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | | 1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | | |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Law Faculty Board | 1999-09-01 | 2000-08-31 | | Dr McInnis Joel Arthur | 1994-08-30 | 1994-08-31 | | Mr Epstein Edward John | 2004-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | Mrs Booth Christine Nicolle | 1996-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Mrs Booth Christine Nicolle | 2001-09-01 | 2003-08-31 | | | 1994-09-01 | 1996-03-10 | | Mr Tokley Ian | 2000-09-01 | 2001-08-31 | | Ms McCook Helen Joan | 1993-09-01 | 1994-08-31 | | Professor Byrnes Andrew Colin | 2017-09-01 | 2019-08-31 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2017-08-31 | | | 2003-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | Professor Halkyard Andrew John | 2013-09-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2011-09-01 | 2013-08-31 | | |
|
One postgraduate student appointed by the Senate, on the recommendation of the Executive Committee of the PGSA | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Senate | 2005-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | Dr Kwan Sheung Him |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Education Faculty Board | 1996-09-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Dr Brown Hubert Owen | 1994-08-30 | 1994-08-31 | | Dr Brown Hubert Owen | 2016-10-24 | 2018-08-31 | | Dr Kwan Alvin Chi Ming | 2000-12-07 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1994-09-01 | 1996-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-08-31 | | | 1996-09-01 | 1998-08-31 | | |
|
Secretary | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | 1999-11-02 | 2001-02-19 | | Dr Huey Herbert Man Chiu | 1995-09-01 | 1997-05-31 | | Mr Lai Stephen King Kay | 1998-05-25 | 1999-11-01 | | Mrs Hill Alice Nyuk Foon | 2007-08-13 | | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth | 1997-06-01 | 1998-05-24 | | Ms Chik Elaine Wing Yee | 2001-02-20 | 2007-08-12 | | Ms Mak Ivy Suet Mui | 1994-09-01 | 1995-08-31 | | Ms Yu Lisa Wei Man |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Social Sciences Faculty Board | 2000-01-01 | 2001-12-31 | | | 2006-01-01 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2016-01-01 | 2017-12-31 | | | 2012-08-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 1996-01-01 | 1997-12-31 | | | 1993-01-01 | 1995-12-31 | | |
|
The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Council | 2009-09-01 | 2010-01-11 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1991-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | | 2016-03-27 | 2019-03-26 | | | 2013-03-27 | 2016-03-26 | | | 2010-03-31 | 2013-01-11 | | |
|
Up to two members, co-opted by the Committee | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | |
The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | Information Technology Advisory Committee | President and Vice-Chancellor | 1997-04-01 | 1997-04-30 | | | 1997-03-01 | 1997-03-31 | | | 1997-05-01 | 2000-04-11 | | |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Medicine Faculty Board | 2004-01-13 | | | | 1991-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2004-01-12 | | |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Business and Economics Faculty Board | 2003-06-16 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2012-01-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2001-04-02 | 2003-06-15 | | | 2017-07-01 | 2018-08-31 | | |
|