The Senate member appointed by the Council to the JUCC | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Council | 2009-09-01 | 2010-01-11 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2009-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2004-08-31 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | | 1991-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | | 2016-03-27 | 2019-03-26 | | | 2013-03-27 | 2016-03-26 | | | 2010-03-31 | 2013-01-11 | | |
|
Up to two members, co-opted by the Committee | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | |
The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | Information Technology Advisory Committee | President and Vice-Chancellor | 1997-04-01 | 1997-04-30 | | | 1997-03-01 | 1997-03-31 | | | 1997-05-01 | 2000-04-11 | | |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Medicine Faculty Board | 2004-01-13 | | | | 1991-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2004-01-12 | | |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Business and Economics Faculty Board | 2003-06-16 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2012-01-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2001-04-02 | 2003-06-15 | | | 2017-07-01 | 2018-08-31 | | |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Architecture Faculty Board | 2009-07-01 | | | | 2001-11-28 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Mr Bradford John William | 1996-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Mr Bradford John William | 1990-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Mr Bradford John William | 2000-10-25 | 2001-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Kvan Thomas |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | 2007-09-01 | 2011-12-31 | | | 2008-09-01 | 2010-08-31 | | Dr Kwan Alvin Chi Ming | 2006-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | | Dr Kwan Alvin Chi Ming | 2005-01-03 | 2006-08-31 | | Dr Kwan Alvin Chi Ming | 2009-11-25 | 2010-02-28 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2005-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2005-06-30 | | | 2010-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | | 2008-07-01 | 2010-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2012-01-01 | 2012-07-31 | | | 2010-01-01 | 2011-12-31 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2009-12-31 | | | 2005-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2004-01-01 | 2004-12-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2009-07-10 | | Mr Lewis Donald James | 2005-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2018-05-10 | 2020-05-09 | | | 2018-01-01 | 2019-12-31 | | | 2009-08-16 | 2009-11-24 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2008-07-31 | | | 2011-07-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2009-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2007-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2012-01-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2011-04-28 | 2011-12-31 | | | 2010-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2009-01-01 | 2009-12-31 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2007-01-01 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2006-01-01 | 2006-12-31 | | | 2005-01-01 | 2005-12-31 | | | 2004-03-15 | 2004-12-31 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 2010-03-01 | 2012-02-28 | | | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 1998-09-01 | 1999-08-31 | | Professor Smart Philip St John | 2009-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | | 2018-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | | 2004-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2015-04-09 | 2017-03-10 | | | 2009-01-16 | 2009-08-15 | | | 2008-08-01 | 2009-01-15 | | |
|
The Chairman (President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative) | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | 2018-08-01 | 2023-07-31 | | | 2013-09-10 | 2018-07-31 | | | 2008-04-12 | 2010-01-11 | | | 2006-04-12 | 2008-04-11 | | | 2004-12-13 | 2006-04-11 | | | 2002-06-03 | 2004-04-11 | | | 2000-04-12 | 2002-04-11 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2010-02-25 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2013-06-06 | 2013-09-09 | | |
|
Vice-Chancellor | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2012-09-01 | 2013-08-09 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1988-01-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu |
|
The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Dentistry Faculty Board | 1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Chan Cho Yee Joseph | 1997-07-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Dr Zee Kwan Yat | 1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Dr Zee Kwan Yat | 1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Zee Kwan Yat | 2001-07-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 2019-03-11 | 2021-03-10 | | | 2017-03-11 | 2019-03-10 | | |
|
The Chairman of the Advisory and Coordination Group on Information Infrastructure and Services | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | |
Three members from the non-Faculty units, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | 2018-01-01 | 2019-12-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2017-10-16 | 2019-10-15 | | Mr Hui Antony Tak Fai | 2017-10-16 | 2019-10-15 | | Mr Lai Chak Kong |
|
The Executive Vice-President (Administration and Finance) | Information Technology Policy Committee | | 2018-03-28 | 2019-09-30 | | | 2020-08-17 | 2022-04-30 | | Mr Lo Chit Ki Steve | 2022-12-15 | 2024-01-19 | | | 2024-09-03 | | | | 2024-01-20 | 2024-09-02 | | |
|
The Director of Information Technology Services | Information Technology Policy Committee | | 2018-03-28 | 2021-05-09 | | Dr Ho Pui Tak |
|
Secretary | Information Technology Policy Committee | | 2018-04-13 | 2023-05-01 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth | 2023-05-02 | | | Ms Ng Flora Lai-kuen |
|
A teacher who is a member of the Faculty of Architecture, Dentistry, Engineering, Medicine, or Science, appointed by the Council on the nomination of the President & Vice-Chancellor | Information Technology Policy Committee | Council | 2023-03-24 | | | | 2018-05-30 | 2021-05-29 | | |
|
A teacher who is a member of the Faculty of Arts, Business & Economics, Education, Law, or Social Sciences, appointed by the Council on the nomination of the President & Vice-Chancellor | Information Technology Policy Committee | Council | 2023-03-24 | | | | 2018-05-30 | 2021-05-29 | | |
|
Chief Information Officer and University Librarian | Information Technology Policy Committee | | 2021-05-10 | | | Ms Ng Flora Lai-kuen |
|
Two students reading for the programmes offered by the Institute, elected by the students similarly so registered | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2010-12-01 | 2011-11-30 | | Dr Lee Ka Yiu | 2009-12-01 | 2010-11-30 | | Dr Lee Ka Yiu | 2008-12-01 | 2009-11-30 | | Dr Lee Ka Yiu |
|
Dean of a Faculty nominated by the Vice-Chancellor and appointed for two years at a time | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | Senate | 2005-05-01 | 2006-02-28 | | | 2003-05-27 | 2005-04-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-11-30 | | | 2010-11-25 | 2012-11-30 | | | 2007-08-16 | 2010-07-03 | | | 2010-08-04 | 2010-11-24 | | | 2006-05-26 | 2007-08-15 | | |
|