The Chairmen of Faculty Information Technology Committees | Information Technology Advisory Committee | Dentistry Faculty Board | 1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Chan Cho Yee Joseph | 1997-07-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Dr Zee Kwan Yat | 1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Dr Zee Kwan Yat | 1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | | Dr Zee Kwan Yat | 2001-07-01 | 2002-12-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 2019-03-11 | 2021-03-10 | | | 2017-03-11 | 2019-03-10 | | |
|
The Chairman of the Advisory and Coordination Group on Information Infrastructure and Services | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | |
Three members from the non-Faculty units, appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Information Technology Advisory Committee | | 2018-01-01 | 2019-12-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2017-10-16 | 2019-10-15 | | Mr Hui Antony Tak Fai | 2017-10-16 | 2019-10-15 | | Mr Lai Chak Kong |
|
The Executive Vice-President (Administration and Finance) | Information Technology Policy Committee | | 2018-03-28 | 2019-09-30 | | | 2020-08-17 | 2022-04-30 | | Mr Lo Chit Ki Steve | 2022-12-15 | 2024-01-19 | | | 2024-09-03 | | | | 2024-01-20 | 2024-09-02 | | |
|
The Director of Information Technology Services | Information Technology Policy Committee | | 2018-03-28 | 2021-05-09 | | Dr Ho Pui Tak |
|
Secretary | Information Technology Policy Committee | | 2018-04-13 | 2023-05-01 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth | 2023-05-02 | | | Ms Ng Flora Lai-kuen |
|
A teacher who is a member of the Faculty of Architecture, Dentistry, Engineering, Medicine, or Science, appointed by the Council on the nomination of the President & Vice-Chancellor | Information Technology Policy Committee | Council | 2023-03-24 | | | | 2018-05-30 | 2021-05-29 | | |
|
A teacher who is a member of the Faculty of Arts, Business & Economics, Education, Law, or Social Sciences, appointed by the Council on the nomination of the President & Vice-Chancellor | Information Technology Policy Committee | Council | 2023-03-24 | | | | 2018-05-30 | 2021-05-29 | | |
|
Chief Information Officer and University Librarian | Information Technology Policy Committee | | 2021-05-10 | | | Ms Ng Flora Lai-kuen |
|
Two students reading for the programmes offered by the Institute, elected by the students similarly so registered | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2010-12-01 | 2011-11-30 | | Dr Lee Ka Yiu | 2009-12-01 | 2010-11-30 | | Dr Lee Ka Yiu | 2008-12-01 | 2009-11-30 | | Dr Lee Ka Yiu |
|
Dean of a Faculty nominated by the Vice-Chancellor and appointed for two years at a time | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | Senate | 2005-05-01 | 2006-02-28 | | | 2003-05-27 | 2005-04-30 | | | 2012-12-01 | 2014-11-30 | | | 2010-11-25 | 2012-11-30 | | | 2007-08-16 | 2010-07-03 | | | 2010-08-04 | 2010-11-24 | | | 2006-05-26 | 2007-08-15 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2014-04-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | |
|
Such other persons not being teachers as the Senate may appoint to the Board on the nomination of the Board; provided that the number of such persons shall not exceed one-fourth of the whole number of members of the Board | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | Senate | 2005-09-01 | 2007-12-31 | | Dr Maxwell Jonathan Philip | 2003-07-25 | 2005-08-31 | | Dr Maxwell Jonathan Philip | 2005-08-02 | 2008-08-01 | | | 2003-07-25 | 2004-08-31 | | Mr Smith Frederick Cathcart | 2003-07-25 | 2005-08-31 | | Ms Beach Cheryl Lillias |
|
Full-time teachers in the Institute | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2013-01-23 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2015-08-17 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2013-06-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | Dr Maxwell Jonathan Philip | 2009-04-01 | 2013-06-30 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2009-03-31 | | | 2003-09-01 | 2006-08-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-08-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2010-01-01 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2009-08-02 | 2012-01-14 | | | 2008-08-02 | 2009-08-01 | | | 2013-11-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2013-09-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2010-01-28 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2004-07-14 | 2004-12-31 | | Professor Auld Christopher John | 2002-07-01 | 2004-07-13 | | Professor Auld Christopher John | 2012-08-03 | 2015-08-02 | | | 2009-08-03 | 2012-08-02 | | | 2008-04-01 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2005-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | | | 2004-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-08-31 | | |
|
Dean of a Faculty nominated by the Vice-Chancellor and appointed for two years at a time | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | |
The Secretary | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2013-10-07 | 2016-06-30 | | Miss Yu Wing Kay Betty | 2003-05-27 | 2007-12-20 | | Mrs Ma Leung Wendy Oi Ling | 2009-03-09 | 2013-04-29 | | Ms Cheung Annie Man See | 2011-11-08 | 2012-01-25 | | Ms Tang Liza Meng | 2010-01-04 | 2010-02-23 | | Ms Tang Liza Meng | 2008-09-16 | 2009-03-08 | | Ms Tang Liza Meng | 2013-04-30 | 2013-10-06 | | Ms Wong Isabeau Pui Shan | 2007-12-21 | 2008-09-15 | | Ms Wong Katherine Ka Wing |
|
The Assistant Directors of the Institute | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2012-08-14 | 2016-06-30 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2009-08-14 | 2012-08-13 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2006-08-14 | 2009-08-13 | | Dr Lo Simon Hing Yeung | 2003-03-01 | 2009-10-04 | | | 2009-10-05 | 2012-12-31 | | | 2005-06-13 | 2006-06-03 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2003-02-28 | | | 2013-03-28 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2012-11-01 | 2016-06-30 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2009-11-01 | 2012-10-31 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2006-11-01 | 2009-10-31 | | Dr Tse Michael Andrew | 2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Dr Whitby Dennis George | 2002-07-01 | 2005-11-21 | | Mr Cinnamond Stanley Thomas | 2002-07-01 | 2013-03-31 | | |
|
The Director of the Institute (Chairman) | Institute of Human Performance, Board of Studies of the | | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 2011-07-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2010-01-28 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2007-01-28 | 2010-01-27 | | | 2004-01-28 | 2007-01-27 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-09-15 | | Professor Auld Christopher John | 2013-04-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
|
The Director of the Institute of Human Performance | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 2011-07-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2010-01-28 | 2011-06-30 | | | 2007-01-28 | 2010-01-27 | | | 2004-01-28 | 2007-01-27 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2002-09-15 | | Professor Auld Christopher John | 2013-04-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
|
A member of the Staff Sports Club, nominated by the Committee of Management and appointed by the Senate for two years at a time | Institute of Human Performance, Committee of Management of the | Senate | 2013-05-01 | 2014-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2011-05-01 | 2013-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2009-05-01 | 2011-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2007-05-01 | 2009-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2005-05-01 | 2007-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2003-05-17 | 2005-04-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2014-10-31 | 2015-06-30 | | |
|