Zhejiang Chinese Medical University | 09/2020 - present | Visiting Professor | | |
|
Zhejiang University | 06/2018 - 05/2020 | Adjunct Professor (unremunerated) | | | 01/2024 new appointment | Adjunct Professor (unremunerated) | | |
|
Zhengzhou University Academy of Medical Sciences (chaired by Professor Nicholas Lemoine, Director of Barts Cancer Institute and Queen Mary University of London) | 2015 - Present | Member, Scientific Advisory Board | | |
|
Zhengzhou University, Henan, China | 3/2002-present | advisory professor | | |
|
Zhong Guo Wenzi Xuehui | 2003- | Member | | Mr Chan Chan Chi Hung |
|
Zhongshan School of Medicine, Sun Yat-sen University, China | 07/2011- 06/2014 | Visiting Professor | | |
|
Zhongshan University, Guangzhou, China | 2002-2005 | visiting professor | | |
|
Zhuhai Arbitration Commission | |
Zhuhai International Court of Arbitration | 01/2021-now | Council Member | | |
|
Zubin Foundation | |
世界中医儿科联合会 | |
世界中医妇科学会 | 2009年8月-2013年8月 | 理事 | | Dr Meng Meng Wei | 2013年6月-2017年11月 | 常务理事 | | Dr Meng Meng Wei |
|
世界中医妇科学会联合会 | 201712月-2021年11月 | 常务理事 | | Dr Meng Meng Wei |
|
世界中医药联盟代谢病专业委员会 | 11/2015- 11/2018 | 委员 | | Dr Zhu Zhu Cui Feng |
|
世界中联医案专业委员会 | 二零一四年至二零一六年年度 | 常务理事 | | Mr Xu Xu Kai |
|
世界中联肿瘤经方治疗专业委员会 | 二零一五年至二零一七年年度 | 副会长 | | Mr Xu Xu Kai |
|
世界中醫學會-生殖醫學學會 | 2018年2月-2022年2月 | 常務理事 | | Dr Meng Meng Wei |
|
世界中醫聯合會老年醫學專業委員會 | |
世界中醫藥學會聯合會急症專業委員會 | 07/2016-至今 | 理事 | | Ms Luo Luo Yi |
|
世界中醫藥學會聯合會熱病專業委員會 | 09/2016-至今 | 常務理事 | | Ms Luo Luo Yi |
|