Secretary | Retirement Review Board | | 1994-05-18 | 1998-05-26 | | Mrs Koo Lam Yvonne Yee Fung | 2004-02-07 | 2005-06-21 | | Ms Chung Judy Lai Chu | 1998-05-27 | 2003-12-31 | | Ms Tang Violet Wai Chu |
|
Registrar | Retirement Review Board | | | 2005-06-21 | | Mr Spooner Michael Garnet |
|
Dean of Students | Retirement Review Board | | | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Brandon William Peter John |
|
The Fellows: Two teachers of the University appointed by the Robert Black College Committee of Management | Robert Black College Committee of Management | RBC Management Committee | 1992-12-18 | 1995-12-17 | | Emeritus Professor Ho Faith Chi Suk | 1996-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon | 1996-01-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony | 1992-12-18 | 1995-12-17 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony |
|
Chairman, appointed by the Council | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2003-07-01 | 2004-02-24 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun | 1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun | 1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun | 1987-04-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun |
|
In attendance | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2002-04-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 1000-07-24 | 2002-03-31 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2000-11-01 | | | Ms Lok Catherina Wai Chue | 2020-07-01 | | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi |
|
The Fellows: Two Members of the Senate, being teachers, appointed by the Senate | Robert Black College Committee of Management | Senate | 1992-07-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 2003-07-01 | 2004-02-24 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 1995-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence | 2008-07-01 | 2009-12-19 | | | 2006-11-28 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2006-11-27 | | | 2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | | 2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | | 1998-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1991-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Wei Stephen Hon Yin | 2008-07-01 | 2009-11-27 | | | 2006-11-28 | 2008-06-30 | | | 2006-07-01 | 2006-11-27 | | | 2004-05-04 | 2006-06-30 | | |
|
Dean of Student Affairs | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2013-04-01 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2008-04-01 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2005-04-01 | 2008-03-31 | | | 2016-01-01 | 2020-08-31 | | Dr Leung Eugenie Yeuk Sin | 2003-12-01 | 2004-10-17 | | Dr Powell Ellis John | 2000-12-01 | 2003-11-30 | | Dr Powell Ellis John | 1999-10-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1999-07-01 | 1999-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1999-01-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-10-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-07-01 | 1997-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 1997-06-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Brandon William Peter John | 2004-10-18 | 2005-03-31 | | | 2000-01-01 | 2000-11-30 | | | 2020-09-01 | | | |
|
The Fellows: Librarian | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2010-05-02 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2008-05-02 | 2010-05-01 | | | 2005-05-02 | 2008-05-01 | | | 2001-05-02 | 2005-05-01 | | | 1998-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1997-04-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1983-12-01 | 1997-03-31 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 2000-04-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr Ma Tai Loi | 1999-07-01 | 1999-08-22 | | Dr Ma Tai Loi | 2000-01-10 | 2000-03-31 | | Dr Tam Lawrence Wai Hong | 2000-07-01 | 2001-05-01 | | Mrs Yan Angela Sui Wui | 1999-08-23 | 1999-12-31 | | Mrs Yan Angela Sui Wui |
|
Secretary | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2013-02-01 | 2013-05-20 | | Mr Ho Tat Kuen | 1994-03-25 | 2005-09-19 | | Mrs Tsang Tse Angela Oi Man | 2013-05-21 | | | Ms Kwok Francisca Suk Wai | 2005-09-20 | 2013-01-31 | | Ms Lin Wendy Yau Lan |
|
The Fellows: Two teachers of the University appointed by the Robert Black College Committee of Management | Robert Black College Committee of Management | R.B.C. Cttee. of Management | 1999-01-01 | 2001-12-31 | | Professor Chan Ching Chuen | 2011-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2004-11-05 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2004-11-04 | | | 1999-01-01 | 2001-12-31 | | | 2011-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | | | 2008-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | | 2004-11-05 | 2007-12-31 | | | 2002-01-01 | 2004-11-04 | | |
|
The Fellows: Director of the Centre of Asian Studies | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2006-03-01 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2001-03-01 | 2006-02-28 | | | 1996-03-01 | 2001-02-28 | | | 1980-06-01 | 1995-08-31 | | Professor Chen Edward Kwan Yiu | 1995-09-01 | 1996-02-29 | | |
|
The Fellows: Director of Finance or his/her nominee | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 1990-04-17 | 2012-06-30 | | Mr Lam Philip Bing Lun | 2019-07-01 | | | Ms Lo Sau Mui | 2012-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | Ms Lo Sau Mui |
|
Chairman, appointed by the Council | Robert Black College Committee of Management | Council | 2004-02-25 | 2005-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1995-01-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | 2023-07-14 | | |
|
Four co-opted members | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2016-06-15 | 2019-06-14 | | | 2017-02-27 | 2020-02-06 | | | 2016-06-15 | 2019-06-14 | | | 2016-02-02 | 2017-02-26 | | | 2013-02-02 | 2016-02-01 | | | 2010-02-02 | 2013-02-01 | | | 2016-06-15 | 2019-06-14 | | |
|
The Fellows: Two teachers of the University appointed by the Robert Black College Committee of Management | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2017-02-27 | 2019-12-31 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | | 2017-02-27 | 2019-12-31 | | | 2014-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | |
|
The Fellows: Director, HKU SPACE | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 1997-09-01 | 1998-01-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1997-07-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 2008-02-01 | 2011-02-23 | | | 1996-12-01 | 1997-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1996-11-30 | | Mr Howarth William Brian | 1992-01-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Lee Ngok | 2003-02-01 | 2008-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming | 1998-02-01 | 2003-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
|
Master of the College | Robert Black College Committee of Management | | 2014-11-01 | 2015-10-31 | | | 2011-11-01 | 2014-10-31 | | | 2008-11-01 | 2011-10-31 | | | 2005-10-01 | 2008-10-31 | | | 2015-11-01 | 2018-12-31 | | | 2005-02-25 | 2005-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun | 2004-02-25 | 2005-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun | 2019-01-01 | 2021-12-31 | | |
|
The Vice-Chancellor, or his nominee (Chairman) | Robert Tam Library Endowment Fund Committee of Management | President and Vice-Chancellor | 1997-09-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1996-03-14 | 1997-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|