2006-07-01 | 2007-06-30 | | Dr Berry Vivien Elizabeth |
2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Dr Berry Vivien Elizabeth |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Dr Berry Vivien Elizabeth |
2015-03-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2012-03-01 | 2015-02-28 | | |
2009-03-01 | 2012-02-29 | | |
2006-03-01 | 2009-02-28 | | |
2003-03-01 | 2006-02-28 | | |
2000-03-01 | 2003-02-28 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Dr Bruce Iain Charles |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Dr Bruce Iain Charles |
1990-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Dr Bruce Iain Charles |
1999-07-01 | 2001-10-03 | | Dr Cao Liang |
1998-08-26 | 1999-06-30 | | Dr Cao Liang |
1997-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | Dr Cao Liang |
2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2012-01-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2009-01-01 | 2011-12-31 | | |
2006-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | |
2004-01-21 | 2005-12-31 | | |
2018-12-21 | 2019-08-22 | | |
2015-12-08 | 2018-12-01 | | |
2012-09-01 | 2014-06-30 | | |
2005-10-08 | 2008-10-07 | | Dr Chan Wai Kwok Alex |
2002-10-08 | 2005-10-07 | | Dr Chan Wai Kwok Alex |
2000-10-08 | 2002-10-07 | | Dr Chan Wai Kwok Alex |
1998-10-08 | 2000-10-07 | | Dr Chan Wai Kwok Alex |
1995-10-08 | 1998-10-07 | | Dr Chan Wai Kwok Alex |
2016-05-13 | 2019-05-12 | | |
2013-05-13 | 2016-05-12 | | |
2012-10-15 | 2013-05-12 | | |
2009-10-15 | 2012-10-14 | | |
2013-04-16 | 2015-08-31 | | Dr Chen Kun |
1994-02-01 | 1995-10-15 | | Dr Ching Chi Kong |
2006-01-18 | 2009-01-17 | | Dr Chow Kwok Fai |
2007-07-20 | 2010-07-19 | | |
2004-10-14 | 2007-07-19 | | |
1998-12-01 | 1999-08-31 | | Dr Dickens Paul |
1997-12-01 | 1998-11-30 | | Dr Dickens Paul |
2008-06-04 | 2009-02-04 | | Dr Gandhi Anil |
1999-12-01 | 2002-11-30 | | Dr Higgins David Anthony |
1992-07-01 | 1994-12-11 | | Dr Ho Chiu Ming |
2021-03-12 | 2022-12-31 | | |
2020-05-01 | 2021-03-11 | | |
2017-05-01 | 2020-04-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Dr Ho Wai Kuen |
1990-10-05 | 1994-06-30 | | Dr Hui Wai Mo |
2002-07-01 | 2004-06-30 | | Dr Im Stanley Wang Kit |
1994-04-01 | 1997-03-31 | | Dr Im Stanley Wang Kit |
1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
2018-07-23 | 2020-01-22 | | |
2015-07-23 | 2018-07-22 | | |
2014-07-23 | 2015-07-22 | | |
2011-04-02 | 2011-07-22 | | |
2008-04-02 | 2011-04-01 | | |
1998-10-23 | 2000-02-10 | | Dr Leung Siu Fai |
1998-02-08 | 1998-08-31 | | Dr Leung Siu Fai |
1997-09-01 | 1998-02-07 | | Dr Leung Siu Fai |
1997-04-17 | 1997-08-31 | | Dr Leung Siu Fai |
2010-02-11 | 2013-02-10 | | Dr Leung Yin Hon Alexander |
2005-02-15 | 2008-02-14 | | Dr Li Ka Lun Thomas |
2002-02-15 | 2005-02-14 | | Dr Li Ka Lun Thomas |
1999-05-25 | 2002-02-14 | | Dr Li Ka Lun Thomas |
1996-05-15 | 1999-02-13 | | Dr Li Ka Lun Thomas |
1993-02-15 | 1996-02-14 | | Dr Li Ka Lun Thomas |
2008-11-01 | 2011-10-31 | | |
2005-11-01 | 2008-10-31 | | |
2003-11-01 | 2005-10-31 | | |
2003-01-17 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1998-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr Nandi Panna Lal |
2003-07-01 | 2003-10-06 | | Dr O Karmin |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Dr O Karmin |
1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr O Karmin |
1994-09-30 | 1994-10-01 | | Dr Philipsen Hans Peter |
2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2003-11-01 | 2005-06-30 | | Dr Rodrigo Muhandiramge Raveendranath Chandrakumar |
2000-11-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Dr Rodrigo Muhandiramge Raveendranath Chandrakumar |
1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Dr Sheng Hwai Ping |
1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Dr Sheng Hwai Ping |
2017-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
1992-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | |
1991-10-17 | 1994-06-30 | | Dr Teoh Chan Ching Haan |
2022-04-07 | 2022-12-21 | | |
2019-05-17 | 2022-03-31 | | |
2000-01-01 | 2001-02-28 | | Dr Tsang Wai Kit |
1999-02-12 | 1999-12-31 | | Dr Tsang Wai Kit |
2004-09-01 | 2005-12-18 | | Dr Tse Siu Kwong Anthony |
2004-01-01 | 2004-08-31 | | Dr Tse Siu Kwong Anthony |
2003-09-01 | 2003-12-31 | | Dr Tse Siu Kwong Anthony |
2003-01-16 | 2003-08-31 | | Dr Tse Siu Kwong Anthony |
2001-09-01 | 2002-08-31 | | Dr Tse Siu Kwong Anthony |
2000-01-01 | 2001-08-31 | | Dr Tse Siu Kwong Anthony |
1999-11-18 | 2000-08-31 | | Dr Tse Siu Kwong Anthony |
1999-08-29 | 2000-07-07 | | Dr Wang Zheming |
2019-06-01 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2016-06-01 | 2019-05-31 | | |
1996-11-06 | 1997-04-09 | | Dr Wong Patrick Chow Lum |
2014-06-01 | 2016-05-31 | | |
2011-06-01 | 2014-05-31 | | |
2008-06-01 | 2011-05-31 | | |
2005-06-01 | 2008-05-31 | | |
2002-06-01 | 2005-05-31 | | |
2005-06-17 | 2006-10-31 | | Dr Zee Kwan Yat |
1997-04-10 | 2009-06-30 | | |
1995-03-01 | 1998-02-28 | | |
1989-10-19 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Ho Faith Chi Suk |
2004-03-01 | 2004-09-15 | | |
1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
1995-06-29 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1992-03-20 | 1995-02-28 | | Emeritus Professor Ma Ho Kei |
1991-01-01 | 1993-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Mak-Lieh Felice |
2010-01-15 | 2013-01-14 | | |
2007-01-15 | 2010-01-14 | | |
2003-12-01 | 2006-11-30 | | |
2000-12-01 | 2003-11-30 | | |
1997-12-01 | 2000-11-30 | | |
1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon |
1991-10-17 | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Shortridge Kennedy Francis |
2000-04-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Shortridge Kennedy Francis |
1997-04-01 | 2000-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Shortridge Kennedy Francis |
2010-11-16 | 2012-08-31 | | |
2008-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | |
2005-01-01 | 2007-12-31 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1988-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1997-12-31 | | Mr Green Roger Michael |
1997-03-14 | 1997-06-30 | | Mr Green Roger Michael |
2014-01-17 | 2016-09-30 | | |
2014-07-01 | 2017-06-30 | | |
2001-08-08 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Chan Hin Lee Henry |
2008-12-01 | 2011-11-30 | | |
2005-12-01 | 2008-11-30 | | |
2003-01-17 | 2005-11-30 | | |
2011-02-01 | 2014-01-31 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2008-01-01 | | |
2003-07-30 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2017-04-16 | 2020-04-15 | | |
2014-04-16 | 2017-04-15 | | |
2011-04-16 | 2014-04-15 | | |
2008-04-16 | 2011-04-15 | | |
2005-07-01 | 2008-04-15 | | |
2015-12-08 | 2018-12-07 | | |
2020-01-01 | 2022-12-31 | | |
2017-01-01 | 2019-12-31 | | |
2014-01-01 | 2016-12-31 | | |
2011-01-01 | 2013-12-31 | | |
2008-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | |
2005-03-18 | 2007-01-14 | | Professor Cho Chi Hin |
1994-06-29 | 1994-06-30 | | |
2019-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2010-10-04 | 2013-10-03 | | |
2007-10-04 | 2010-10-03 | | |
2004-10-04 | 2007-10-03 | | |
2002-02-20 | 2004-10-03 | | |
2020-07-08 | 2022-08-31 | | |
1998-11-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1995-12-13 | 1998-10-31 | | |
2018-11-01 | 2021-10-31 | | |
2015-11-01 | 2018-10-31 | | |
2012-11-01 | 2015-10-31 | | |
2009-11-01 | 2012-10-31 | | |
2006-11-01 | 2009-10-31 | | |
2003-11-01 | 2006-10-31 | | |
2000-11-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2019-08-23 | 2022-08-22 | | |
2022-03-01 | | | |
2019-02-20 | 2022-02-05 | | |
2016-02-23 | 2019-02-05 | | |
2013-02-06 | 2016-02-05 | | |
2022-09-22 | | | |
2019-09-22 | 2022-09-21 | | |
2016-08-31 | 2019-09-21 | | |
2001-03-08 | 2004-02-29 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
2017-02-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2014-02-18 | 2017-01-31 | | |
1993-02-01 | 1994-01-31 | | Professor Lau Chu Pak |
2023-10-01 | | | |
2020-10-20 | 2023-09-30 | | |
2017-10-01 | 2020-09-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
2013-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2013-07-01 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2014-10-01 | 2017-09-30 | | |
2013-01-22 | 2014-09-30 | | |
2004-09-16 | 2007-02-28 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Loh Tatt Tuck |
1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Professor Loh Tatt Tuck |
1994-06-29 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Loh Tatt Tuck |
2004-01-01 | 2004-12-31 | | Professor Lucas Peter William |
2001-01-01 | 2003-12-31 | | Professor Lucas Peter William |
1998-01-01 | 2000-12-31 | | Professor Lucas Peter William |
2014-12-01 | 2017-11-30 | | |
2012-05-09 | 2014-11-30 | | |
2003-01-01 | 2004-01-20 | | |
2000-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | | |
1997-02-13 | 1999-12-31 | | |
2020-08-25 | 2022-06-30 | | |
2019-08-22 | 2020-06-30 | | |
2016-07-01 | 2019-06-30 | | |
1994-06-29 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Ogle Clive William |
2010-03-01 | 2011-01-31 | | |
2007-03-01 | 2010-02-28 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2016-01-28 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2010-02-11 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2011-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1990-10-05 | 1997-06-30 | | |
1998-03-01 | 2001-02-28 | | |
2021-07-21 | 2024-06-30 | | |
2018-07-01 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2015-07-01 | 2018-06-30 | | |
2012-07-01 | 2015-06-30 | | |
2009-07-01 | 2012-06-30 | | |
2006-07-01 | 2009-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | |
2002-01-05 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2019-10-22 | 2022-08-31 | | |
2018-08-22 | 2021-06-30 | | |
2009-12-01 | 2011-06-03 | | |
2007-01-19 | 2009-11-30 | | |
1985-07-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Weatherhead Brian |
1988-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Professor White Francis Harold |
2014-12-04 | 2015-07-17 | | |
2013-01-22 | 2014-12-03 | | |
2022-12-22 | | | |
2020-04-16 | 2023-04-15 | | |
2021-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | |
1999-06-01 | 2002-05-31 | | |
1996-06-01 | 1999-05-31 | | |
1993-06-01 | 1996-05-31 | | |
1997-07-01 | 1997-11-30 | | Professor Wu Pui Chee |
1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Professor Wu Pui Chee |
1994-07-01 | 1996-11-05 | | Professor Yeung Desmond Chak Yew |
1991-06-10 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Yeung Desmond Chak Yew |
2023-01-01 | | | |
2006-07-01 | 2008-03-27 | | Professor Yuen Po Wing |
2003-07-01 | 2006-06-30 | | Professor Yuen Po Wing |
2000-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Yuen Po Wing |
1997-12-12 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Yuen Po Wing |
1994-12-12 | 1997-12-11 | | Professor Yuen Po Wing |
2013-10-14 | 2016-06-30 | | |
2010-10-14 | 2013-10-13 | | |
2007-10-14 | 2010-10-13 | | |
2004-10-14 | 2007-10-13 | | |
2022-03-01 | | | |
2019-02-23 | 2022-02-22 | | |
2016-02-23 | 2019-02-22 | | |
2012-12-02 | 2015-12-01 | | |
2011-12-16 | 2012-12-01 | | |