An Associate Dean (Experiential Learning/Teaching and Learning) from each of the three Faculty clusters nominated by the Faculty cluster concerned, appointed for two years at a time (Cluster B: Arts, Business & Economics, Education and Social Sciences) | HKU Horizons Committee | | 2020-09-01 | 2020-12-31 | | | 2023-09-01 | | | | 2021-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | |
|
An Associate Dean (Experiential Learning/Teaching and Learning) from each of the three Faculty clusters nominated by the Faculty cluster concerned, appointed for two years at a time (Cluster C: Dentistry, Law and Medicine) | HKU Horizons Committee | | 2021-09-01 | 2022-09-22 | | | 2022-09-23 | 2023-08-31 | | | 2020-09-01 | 2021-08-31 | | | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | |
|
The Dean of the Faculty of Engineering (Chairman) | Hong Kong and China Gas Company Ltd. Postgraduate Scholarships Fund Selection Committee | | 1997-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1994-07-01 | 1997-06-30 | | | 1992-08-01 | 1995-07-31 | | Professor Lam Tenny Nicolas |
|
Secretary | Hong Kong and China Gas Company Ltd. Postgraduate Scholarships Fund Selection Committee | | 1995-10-01 | 1997-05-31 | | Miss Wong Vivian Tee Vee | | 1994-09-30 | | Mr Chiu Ping Kwan | 1997-06-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Ms Chan Cordelia |
|
Head, Department of Computer Science | Hong Kong and China Gas Company Ltd. Postgraduate Scholarships Fund Selection Committee | | 1997-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | | 1988-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | |
|
Additional co-opted members | Hong Kong and China Gas Company Ltd. Postgraduate Scholarships Fund Selection Committee | | |
A representative of the Faculty of Engineering on the Board of Academic Awards | Hong Kong and China Gas Company Ltd. Postgraduate Scholarships Fund Selection Committee | | 1994-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | | 1994-06-30 | | Dr Dunn Alan | | 1994-06-30 | | |
|
In attendance: A user housed within the building, nominated by the users for two years at a time | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2016-05-01 | 2018-04-30 | | | 2012-05-01 | 2014-04-30 | | | 2018-05-01 | 2020-04-30 | | | 2014-05-01 | 2016-04-30 | | |
|
In attendance: Relevant Deans (or representatives) of users housed within the building | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2012-05-01 | 2015-06-12 | | | 2012-05-01 | | | | 2012-05-01 | 2013-08-13 | | | 2015-06-13 | | | | 2013-08-14 | | | |
|
In attendance: Director of Estates or representative | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2013-08-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2013-07-01 | 2013-07-31 | | Mr Tam King Leung | 2012-05-01 | 2013-06-30 | | Mr Wong Kenneth Pak Keung |
|
Secretary | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2012-04-12 | 2015-09-01 | | Miss Ngai Yuen See | 2015-09-02 | 2017-08-31 | | Ms Hung Lo | 2017-09-01 | | | Ms Lam Pui Keng Alice |
|
Three members of the University Research Committee, nominated by the Chairman of the University Research Committee for two years at a time | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2015-01-01 | 2016-03-31 | | | 2013-01-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2012-05-01 | 2012-09-13 | | | 2016-04-01 | 2017-12-30 | | | 2016-05-01 | 2017-02-17 | | | 2014-05-01 | 2016-04-30 | | | 2012-05-01 | 2014-04-30 | | | 2016-05-01 | 2017-02-17 | | | 2014-05-01 | 2016-04-30 | | | 2012-05-01 | 2014-04-30 | | | 2017-02-17 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2017-12-31 | 2019-12-30 | | | 2019-02-01 | 2021-01-31 | | | 2017-02-17 | 2019-01-31 | | | 2018-04-01 | 2020-03-31 | | |
|
Vice-President and Pro-Vice-Chancellor(Research)(Chairman) | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2015-01-01 | 2015-08-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-12-31 | | | 2012-04-04 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2015-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-04-04 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | 2023-07-14 | | |
|
Chairman, Accommodation Committee | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2017-11-20 | 2020-11-10 | | | 2016-11-20 | 2017-11-19 | | | 2013-11-20 | 2016-11-19 | | | 2012-04-04 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2013-04-01 | 2013-11-19 | | |
|
Up to two members co-opted by the Committee | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2016-09-01 | 2017-02-17 | | | 2018-04-01 | | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor (Vice-Chairman) | Honorary Degrees Committee | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
3 Deans of Faculties, elected by the Senate | Honorary Degrees Committee | Senate | 2000-09-20 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1996-09-05 | 1999-01-09 | | | 1999-04-07 | 2002-01-09 | | | 2011-07-28 | 2014-07-27 | | | 1996-09-05 | 1998-02-28 | | | 2018-05-10 | 2021-05-09 | | | 2002-10-24 | 2003-07-31 | | | 2007-05-21 | 2010-05-20 | | | 2010-05-21 | 2013-05-20 | | | 2005-06-02 | 2008-06-01 | | | 2011-07-28 | 2014-07-27 | | | 2004-05-21 | 2007-05-20 | | | 1998-03-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1999-09-05 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-09-05 | 1999-09-04 | | | 2008-06-02 | 2011-06-01 | | | 2018-05-10 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2004-04-23 | 2007-03-20 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2001-03-29 | 2004-03-28 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2010-05-21 | 2011-03-30 | | | 2018-05-10 | 2021-05-09 | | | 2007-05-21 | 2010-05-20 | | | 2002-04-18 | 2005-04-17 | | | 2000-01-12 | 2001-02-28 | | | 2013-06-12 | 2016-06-11 | | |
|
Secretary | Honorary Degrees Committee | | 1996-07-01 | 2000-07-23 | | Mr Chan Rupert Kwan Yun | 1998-06-25 | 1999-01-06 | | Mrs Kwan Julita Yuk Kwan | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Spooner Michael Garnet | 2000-07-24 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2020-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man | 2024-07-01 | | | |
|
3 Deans of Faculties, elected by the Senate | Honorary Degrees Committee | | 2014-08-15 | 2017-08-14 | | | 2021-06-02 | 2024-06-01 | | | 2019-08-06 | 2022-06-30 | | | 2014-08-15 | 2017-08-14 | | | 2022-09-20 | | | | 2021-06-23 | 2024-04-30 | | |
|