Chairman, Accommodation Committee | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2017-11-20 | 2020-11-10 | | | 2016-11-20 | 2017-11-19 | | | 2013-11-20 | 2016-11-19 | | | 2012-04-04 | 2013-03-31 | | | 2013-04-01 | 2013-11-19 | | |
|
Up to two members co-opted by the Committee | Hong Kong Jockey Club Building for Interdisciplinary Research, Committee for the | | 2016-09-01 | 2017-02-17 | | | 2018-04-01 | | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor (Vice-Chairman) | Honorary Degrees Committee | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
3 Deans of Faculties, elected by the Senate | Honorary Degrees Committee | Senate | 2000-09-20 | 2002-06-30 | | | 1996-09-05 | 1999-01-09 | | | 1999-04-07 | 2002-01-09 | | | 2011-07-28 | 2014-07-27 | | | 1996-09-05 | 1998-02-28 | | | 2018-05-10 | 2021-05-09 | | | 2002-10-24 | 2003-07-31 | | | 2007-05-21 | 2010-05-20 | | | 2010-05-21 | 2013-05-20 | | | 2005-06-02 | 2008-06-01 | | | 2011-07-28 | 2014-07-27 | | | 2004-05-21 | 2007-05-20 | | | 1998-03-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1999-09-05 | 2000-06-30 | | | 1996-09-05 | 1999-09-04 | | | 2008-06-02 | 2011-06-01 | | | 2018-05-10 | 2019-06-30 | | | 2004-04-23 | 2007-03-20 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2001-03-29 | 2004-03-28 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum | 2010-05-21 | 2011-03-30 | | | 2018-05-10 | 2021-05-09 | | | 2007-05-21 | 2010-05-20 | | | 2002-04-18 | 2005-04-17 | | | 2000-01-12 | 2001-02-28 | | | 2013-06-12 | 2016-06-11 | | |
|
Secretary | Honorary Degrees Committee | | 1996-07-01 | 2000-07-23 | | Mr Chan Rupert Kwan Yun | 1998-06-25 | 1999-01-06 | | Mrs Kwan Julita Yuk Kwan | 1992-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Spooner Michael Garnet | 2000-07-24 | 2020-06-30 | | Mr Wai Henry Wing Kun | 2020-07-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Ms Tsang Jeannie Wing Shi | 2023-09-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Ms Yue Dora Kar Man | 2024-07-01 | | | |
|
3 Deans of Faculties, elected by the Senate | Honorary Degrees Committee | | 2014-08-15 | 2017-08-14 | | | 2021-06-02 | 2024-06-01 | | | 2019-08-06 | 2022-06-30 | | | 2014-08-15 | 2017-08-14 | | | 2022-09-20 | | | | 2021-06-23 | 2024-04-30 | | |
|
A Director of the University of Hong Kong Foundation for Educational Development and Research, appointed by his fellow directors | Honorary Degrees Committee | | 2020-09-01 | 2023-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 2017-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 2014-09-01 | 2017-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 2011-09-01 | 2014-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 2008-09-01 | 2011-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 2005-09-01 | 2008-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse | 2002-09-01 | 2005-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
|
The Dean of each Faculty | Honorary Degrees Committee | | 1993-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1996-01-10 | 1996-09-04 | | | 1995-06-30 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1995-03-01 | 1996-09-04 | | | 1995-02-01 | 1997-02-28 | | Emeritus Professor Wei Stephen Hon Yin | 1993-01-10 | 1996-01-09 | | | 1996-07-01 | 1996-09-04 | | | 1994-01-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 1994-07-01 | 1996-09-04 | | | 1993-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Wesley-Smith Peter | 1990-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Will Barry Fegan |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor (Chairman) | Honorary University Fellows, Committee on | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
Secretary | Honorary University Fellows, Committee on | | 2001-02-26 | 2003-07-01 | | Dr Huey Herbert Man Chiu | 2003-07-04 | 2006-05-31 | | Miss Tang Karen Shuk Tak | 1996-01-10 | 2001-02-25 | | Mr Chan Rupert Kwan Yun | 2022-06-30 | 2024-09-08 | | Mr Lee Tin Fan Paul | 2019-10-01 | 2021-09-28 | | Ms Choy Trinni Pui Ying | 2024-09-09 | | | Ms Ho Wing Yin Winnie | 2021-09-29 | 2022-06-29 | | Ms Lee Wai Man | 2009-11-27 | 2019-09-30 | | Ms Ma Katherine Miu Wah | 2006-11-27 | 2009-11-26 | | Ms Ma Katherine Miu Wah |
|
The two members of the Senate elected by the Senate to the Council. | Honorary University Fellows, Committee on | Senate | 1995-08-14 | 1996-09-27 | | Emeritus Professor Ho Faith Chi Suk | 1999-09-28 | 2002-09-27 | | | 1996-09-28 | 1999-09-27 | | Emeritus Professor Mak-Lieh Felice | 2002-09-28 | 2004-02-24 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 1995-08-14 | 1998-06-30 | | | 2001-07-01 | 2004-02-24 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
|
2 members of the Senate elected by the Senate | Honorary University Fellows, Committee on | Senate | 2013-05-13 | 2015-12-31 | | | 2007-04-23 | 2010-04-22 | | | 2016-05-13 | 2019-05-12 | | | 2004-04-23 | 2007-04-22 | | | 2007-04-12 | 2009-11-27 | | | 2005-09-23 | 2006-12-04 | | | 2010-04-02 | 2013-01-11 | | | 2013-05-13 | 2016-05-12 | | | 2010-05-13 | 2013-05-12 | | |
|
2 members of the Senate elected by the Senate | Honorary University Fellows, Committee on | | 2022-11-23 | | | | 2022-03-11 | | | | 2022-05-13 | 2022-10-09 | | | 2019-05-13 | 2022-05-12 | | | 2020-06-11 | 2021-05-15 | | | 2017-02-09 | 2020-02-08 | | |
|
Secretary | Hospital Pathology Services, Committee for the | | |
Head, Department of Pathology | Hospital Pathology Services, Committee for the | | | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Ho Faith Chi Suk |
|
Head, Department of Microbiology | Hospital Pathology Services, Committee for the | | | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon |
|
Head, Clinical Biochemistry Unit | Hospital Pathology Services, Committee for the | | | 1995-09-30 | | Professor Janus Edward Denis |
|
Dean, Faculty of Medicine (or representative) | Hospital Pathology Services, Committee for the | | | 1995-02-28 | | Emeritus Professor Ma Ho Kei |
|
The Dean of the Faculty of Arts (Chairman) | Hsu Long Sing Research Fund Committee of Management | | 1996-07-01 | 1999-06-30 | | | 1993-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | | 1976-11-01 | 1985-10-31 | | Professor Lee Ngok | 1988-02-23 | 1993-06-30 | | Professor Leung Chi Keung |
|
The Head of the Department of Chinese | Hsu Long Sing Research Fund Committee of Management | | 1997-01-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1987-04-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong | 1998-09-01 | 1998-12-31 | | |
|