6 members nominated by the Director of HKU School of Professional and Continuing Education and appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time, of whom at least 4 shall be members of the HKU School of Professional and Continuing Education | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | | 2011-01-01 | 2011-08-22 | | Dr Lee Jane Ching Yee | 2017-07-20 | 2019-07-19 | | Professor Lee Keng Mun William | 2020-03-15 | 2022-03-14 | | Professor Liu Ning Rong | 2018-03-15 | 2020-03-14 | | Professor Liu Ning Rong |
|
Two members of the Management Board, appointed by the Senate | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | Senate | 2000-02-18 | 2004-01-27 | | | 2003-01-11 | 2004-01-27 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung |
|
The Secretary | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | | 1999-12-16 | 2002-10-31 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2022-10-31 | 2024-01-01 | | Miss Wong Vivian Tee Vee | 2007-08-13 | 2022-10-30 | | Ms Brodie Kaye Elizabeth | 2002-11-01 | 2007-08-12 | | Ms Mak Ivy Suet Mui | 2024-01-08 | | | Ms Wong Jennifer See Ming |
|
Two additional Senate members, appointed by the Vice-Chancellor | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | President and Vice-Chancellor | 2000-02-18 | 2004-01-27 | | | 2000-02-18 | 2004-01-27 | | |
|
One representative from each of the eight SPACE divisions | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | Dr Kwong Tsz Man | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | Dr Lam Keith Pui Chaun | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | Mr Booker Richard McKay | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | Mr Booker Richard McKay | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | Mr Fisher Michael John | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | Mr Lam David How Yin | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | Ms Davies Bronwyn Lee | 2002-07-01 | 2004-01-27 | | Ms Ng Jennifer Glok Hong | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | Ms Ng Jennifer Glok Hong | 2002-07-01 | 2003-08-03 | | Professor Hui Sarah Siu Chun | 2000-02-18 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Hui Sarah Siu Chun |
|
Director of SPACE (ex-officio) | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | | 2003-02-01 | 2006-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming | 1999-12-16 | 2003-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor or his representative (Chairman) | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-09-01 | 2019-03-31 | | | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1999-12-16 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2019-04-17 | | | | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 2018-07-15 | 2018-08-31 | | |
|
Pro-Vice-Chancellor (Academic) (Vice-Chairman) | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | | 1999-12-16 | 2000-09-06 | | | 2003-12-20 | 2004-01-27 | | | 2000-12-20 | 2003-12-19 | | |
|
6 members nominated by the Director of HKU School of Professional and Continuing Education and appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time, of whom at least 4 shall be members of the HKU School of Professional and Continuing Education | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | Senate | 2022-09-01 | | | Dr Cheung Bruce Siu Nang | 2022-11-02 | | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | Dr Cribbin John Antony | 2007-01-01 | 2008-12-31 | | Dr Lee Jane Ching Yee | 2005-01-01 | 2006-12-31 | | Dr Lee Jane Ching Yee | 2006-02-13 | 2007-10-05 | | Dr Luk Yan Lung Michael | 2004-02-13 | 2006-02-12 | | Dr Luk Yan Lung Michael | 2012-02-13 | 2014-02-12 | | | 2010-02-13 | 2012-02-12 | | | 2008-02-13 | 2010-02-12 | | | 2006-02-13 | 2008-02-12 | | | 2004-02-13 | 2006-02-12 | | | 2014-02-01 | 2015-06-30 | | | 2012-02-01 | 2014-01-31 | | | 2010-04-01 | 2012-01-31 | | | 2008-03-15 | 2010-01-31 | | | 2013-10-06 | 2014-06-30 | | | 2011-10-06 | 2013-10-05 | | | 2009-10-06 | 2011-10-05 | | | 2004-02-13 | 2004-02-13 | | Ms Ng Jennifer Glok Hong | 2020-09-01 | 2022-08-31 | | Professor Chan Lung Sang | 2018-09-01 | 2020-08-31 | | Professor Chan Lung Sang | 2016-09-01 | 2018-08-31 | | Professor Chan Lung Sang | 2014-09-01 | 2016-08-31 | | Professor Chan Lung Sang | 2016-07-01 | 2017-02-28 | | Professor Chan Wing Wah | 2014-07-01 | 2016-06-30 | | Professor Chan Wing Wah | 2007-10-06 | 2009-10-05 | | Professor Cheng Kin Fai | 2023-07-20 | | | Professor Lee Keng Mun William | 2019-07-20 | 2023-07-19 | | Professor Lee Keng Mun William | 2015-07-29 | 2017-07-19 | | Professor Lee Keng Mun William | 2022-03-15 | 2022-08-31 | | Professor Liu Ning Rong | 2016-03-15 | 2018-03-14 | | Professor Liu Ning Rong | 2024-07-01 | | | Professor Lo Shiu Hing Sonny | 2022-07-01 | 2024-06-30 | | Professor Lo Shiu Hing Sonny | 2020-07-01 | 2022-06-30 | | Professor Lo Shiu Hing Sonny | 2018-07-01 | 2020-06-30 | | Professor Lo Shiu Hing Sonny | 2017-03-01 | 2018-06-30 | | Professor Lo Shiu Hing Sonny | 2013-08-23 | 2014-06-30 | | Professor Wong Tak Ming | 2011-08-23 | 2013-08-22 | | Professor Wong Tak Ming | 2009-01-01 | 2010-12-31 | | Professor Wong Tak Ming | 2006-02-13 | 2008-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming | 2004-02-13 | 2006-02-12 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
|
6 members from the University, appointed by the Senate for 2 years at a time | Continuing and Professional Education (CPE) and Lifelong Learning, Board for | | 2020-02-13 | 2022-02-12 | | | 2018-02-13 | 2020-02-12 | | | 2018-04-01 | 2019-02-28 | | | 2017-07-03 | 2019-04-16 | | | 2018-04-01 | 2020-03-31 | | | 2020-04-01 | 2022-03-31 | | | 2020-02-13 | 2022-02-12 | | | 2018-02-13 | 2020-02-12 | | |
|
Secretary | Convocation Standing Committee | | 1997-09-01 | 2006-05-15 | | Miss Chung Janet Pui Fan | 1995-05-10 | 1996-09-30 | | Miss Fan Susan Man Shan | 2006-05-16 | | | Ms Wong Monica Pui Yiu | 1996-10-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Ms Yeung Shirley Shuet Kwan |
|
Clerk of Convocation | Convocation Standing Committee | | 1993-04-15 | 1997-05-10 | | Mr Tsui Anthony Tin Yau |
|
Twenty-one Member Convocation | Convocation Standing Committee | Convocation | 2005-09-01 | 2008-12-31 | | | 2009-07-05 | 2015-06-25 | | | 2006-09-01 | 2009-06-22 | | | 1995-08-30 | 1995-08-31 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1995-05-10 | 1998-08-31 | | Dr Kan Lai Bing | 1985-09-01 | 1995-08-31 | | Mrs Alleyne Ellie Lynn | 1993-08-30 | 1993-08-31 | | Ms Tsui Bernadette Wing Suen | 2017-06-20 | | | | 1994-08-30 | 1994-08-31 | | Professor Lee Andrew King Fun |
|
Secretary to Convocation | Convocation Standing Committee | | 1995-02-03 | 1999-02-02 | | Mr Chan Rupert Kwan Yun | 1999-02-03 | 2022-06-30 | | Ms Tsui Bernadette Wing Suen | 2022-07-01 | | | Ms Wong Isabella Yee Sin |
|
Two HKU Alumni Assn. Nominees | Convocation Standing Committee | Convocation | | 1986-01-11 | | Professor Lee Andrew King Fun |
|
Deputy Secretary to Convocation | Convocation Standing Committee | | 1996-10-01 | 2008-01-16 | | Miss Chung Janet Pui Fan | 1995-05-10 | 1996-06-30 | | Mr Cheung Dominic Ho Kin |
|
Two members of the Senate elected by the Senate | Council | Senate | 1991-06-03 | 1994-06-02 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon | 1993-09-28 | 1996-09-27 | | Emeritus Professor Ho Faith Chi Suk | 1984-12-22 | 1990-12-21 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun | 1999-09-28 | 2002-09-27 | | | 1996-09-28 | 1999-09-27 | | Emeritus Professor Mak-Lieh Felice | 2002-09-28 | 2003-10-31 | | | 1998-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | | 1995-07-01 | 1998-06-30 | | | | 1984-12-21 | | Emeritus Professor Sir Todd David | 1994-04-26 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Lee Ngok | 2001-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
|
4 full-time teachers elected in accordance with regulations | Council | | 2006-12-05 | 2009-06-30 | | | 2005-09-27 | 2006-12-04 | | | 2015-12-09 | 2018-12-08 | | | 2012-12-09 | 2015-12-08 | | | 2009-12-09 | 2012-12-08 | | | 2022-01-05 | 2022-11-06 | | | 2006-12-05 | 2009-12-04 | | | 2012-12-09 | 2015-12-08 | | | 2006-12-05 | 2009-12-04 | | | 2003-12-05 | 2006-12-04 | | | 2021-04-18 | 2024-04-17 | | | 2021-11-20 | | | | 2003-12-05 | 2006-12-04 | | | 2015-11-20 | 2018-11-19 | | | 2021-11-08 | | | | 2018-11-08 | 2021-11-07 | | | 2018-12-09 | 2021-12-08 | | | 2022-11-22 | | | | 2009-12-09 | 2012-12-08 | | | 2024-04-18 | | | | 2012-12-09 | 2014-08-31 | | | 2009-12-09 | 2012-12-08 | | | 2018-04-18 | 2021-04-17 | | | 2015-04-18 | 2018-04-17 | | | 2015-12-09 | 2018-08-19 | | | 2009-12-09 | 2012-12-08 | | | 2006-12-05 | 2009-12-04 | | | 2003-12-05 | 2006-12-04 | | | 2012-12-09 | 2015-11-19 | | | 2018-11-20 | 2021-11-19 | | |
|
President and Vice-Chancellor | Council | | 2000-11-08 | 2002-08-31 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2000-10-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees | 2018-02-01 | 2018-07-14 | | | 1996-03-14 | 2000-09-06 | | Professor Cheng Yiu Chung | 2014-04-01 | 2018-01-31 | | | 2012-09-01 | 2014-03-31 | | | 2007-09-01 | 2012-08-31 | | | 2002-09-01 | 2007-08-31 | | | 1986-08-01 | 1995-12-31 | | Professor Wang Gungwu | 2018-07-15 | | | |
|
1 full-time postgraduate student elected in accordance with regulations | Council | | 2008-11-05 | 2009-11-04 | | Mr Fung Wai Sin | 2006-03-19 | 2007-03-18 | | Mr Wong Hin Cheong |
|