2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1995-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On |
2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On |
1979-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Daniel Kwong On |
1997-08-29 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2003-02-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon |
2002-12-22 | 2003-01-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon |
2001-06-21 | 2002-12-21 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon |
1984-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Samuel Ting Hon |
1980-11-01 | 1995-07-31 | | Emeritus Professor Chan Tai Kwong |
1993-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1997-05-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1995-08-22 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1982-06-24 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Cheung Steven Ng Sheong |
1977-08-08 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1989-08-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong |
1984-09-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Chiu Ling Yeong |
1991-02-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1990-11-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1981-08-17 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Cooke Brian Lawrence |
1980-01-01 | 2000-11-07 | | Emeritus Professor Davies William Ian Rees |
2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1995-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1993-11-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Fung Peter Chin Wan |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Fung Peter Chin Wan |
2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Fung Peter Chin Wan |
1984-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Fung Peter Chin Wan |
2003-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1989-12-08 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1991-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Goldstein Laurence |
1993-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad |
1995-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Hansen Chad |
2003-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | |
1988-07-11 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1993-06-04 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1985-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Ho Faith Chi Suk |
1996-04-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1982-03-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kao Henry Shang Ren |
1987-05-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
2000-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
1992-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Kumana Cyrus Rustam |
1997-09-03 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1997-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1997-04-02 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Lam Wah Kit |
1999-03-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1996-03-01 | 1999-02-28 | | |
1995-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1981-06-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Leong John Chi Yan |
1977-04-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Leung Wai Sun |
1999-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Lye Kum Chew |
1976-08-09 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Lye Kum Chew |
1972-07-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ma Ho Kei |
1981-01-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Mak-Lieh Felice |
1998-01-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1995-01-15 | 1997-12-31 | | |
1998-07-26 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1995-07-26 | 1998-07-25 | | |
1979-08-31 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Moore Francis Charles Timothy |
1982-08-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Morton Brian Sydney |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon |
1999-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon |
1979-01-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Ng Mun Hon |
1990-12-15 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1982-09-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Redding Stanley Gordon |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Saing Htut |
2000-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Saing Htut |
1990-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Saing Htut |
1997-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1993-01-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Shortridge Kennedy Francis |
1981-03-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Shortridge Kennedy Francis |
1996-07-01 | 1997-01-31 | | Emeritus Professor Sir Todd David |
1972-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Sir Todd David |
1996-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Emeritus Professor Tideman Henk |
2002-07-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Tideman Henk |
1988-07-16 | 2002-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Tideman Henk |
1997-09-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1990-09-01 | 2001-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Wacks Raymond Ivor |
1985-04-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Walker Anthony |
1984-09-03 | 1998-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Wei Stephen Hon Yin |
1991-12-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1987-08-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2000-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1997-09-01 | 2000-06-30 | | |
1995-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | |
1999-07-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Yeung Chap Yung |
1980-09-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Yeung Chap Yung |
1999-01-01 | 1999-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
1998-04-01 | 1998-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
1997-10-01 | 1998-03-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
1997-07-01 | 1997-09-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
1997-01-01 | 1997-06-30 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
1974-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Emeritus Professor Young Rosie Tse Tse |
1992-04-25 | 1994-04-24 | | Professor Alexander Albert Geoffrey |
1994-04-01 | 1997-03-31 | | Professor Barnes Ian Ernest |
1987-09-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Biggs John Burville |
1997-09-12 | 1998-09-11 | | Professor Browne Nicholas Kaptyn |
2000-11-01 | 2002-10-31 | | Professor Chan Ching Chuen |
1992-11-01 | 2000-10-31 | | Professor Chan Ching Chuen |
2003-09-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Chan Moira Mo Wah |
2000-09-01 | 2003-08-31 | | Professor Chan Moira Mo Wah |
1998-09-01 | 2000-08-31 | | Professor Chan Moira Mo Wah |
2000-11-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1992-11-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1980-06-01 | 1996-04-01 | | Professor Chen Edward Kwan Yiu |
2000-01-09 | 2000-04-08 | | Professor Child John |
1998-01-09 | 2000-01-08 | | Professor Child John |
2000-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Cho Chi Hin |
1993-09-19 | 1996-08-31 | | Professor Chou Ju Hsi |
1991-11-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Chwang Allen Tse Yung |
1989-09-01 | 1997-08-31 | | Professor Cowan Richard |
1993-08-29 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Dickman Michael David |
1994-05-04 | 2002-05-31 | | Professor Dixon Anthony Simon |
1995-08-01 | 2003-04-30 | | Professor Fletcher Paul Jeffrey |
2000-07-29 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Frewer Richard John Barrett |
1992-11-06 | 1994-11-05 | | Professor Goldschmidt Ernst Walter Matthias |
2002-07-01 | 2002-12-31 | | Professor Greenleaf Graham William |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Greenleaf Graham William |
1998-05-03 | 2000-05-02 | | Professor He Guo-Wei |
1995-05-03 | 1998-05-02 | | Professor He Guo-Wei |
1993-07-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Hill Ronald David |
1999-12-07 | 2002-12-06 | | Professor Hugon Jacques |
1996-01-01 | 2000-08-31 | | Professor Hwang Kai |
1993-07-14 | 1996-12-16 | | Professor Joseph John Earl |
2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung |
1992-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Ko Ronald Chun Chung |
1998-12-04 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Kung Hsiang-fu |
1992-07-01 | 1996-12-31 | | Professor Kwan David Chiu Yin |
2001-08-18 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Lam Eric |
2003-09-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
2003-07-01 | 2003-08-31 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
1984-09-01 | 2003-06-30 | | Professor Lam Shiu Kum |
| 1994-08-31 | | Professor Lam Tenny Nicolas |
2003-07-14 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1997-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Lau Chu Pak |
1999-11-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2001-09-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Lee Leo Ou-Fan |
1987-01-01 | 1995-06-30 | | Professor Lee Ngok |
2002-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Lie Ken Jie Marcel Soe Fa |
2001-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Lie Ken Jie Marcel Soe Fa |
1997-07-01 | 2001-06-30 | | Professor Lie Ken Jie Marcel Soe Fa |
1999-07-01 | 2002-06-30 | | Professor Lim Shirley Geok Lin |
1990-11-01 | 2000-06-30 | | Professor Liu Ming Chit |
1999-09-02 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1997-09-02 | 1999-09-01 | | |
2001-08-02 | 2001-12-16 | | Professor Malanczuk Peter |
1994-02-01 | 1997-01-31 | | Professor Marett Allan John |
2000-09-01 | 2001-08-31 | | Professor Marton Ference Istvan |
1998-09-01 | 2000-08-31 | | Professor Marton Ference Istvan |
1997-09-01 | 1998-08-31 | | Professor Mittler Peter Joseph |
1992-09-15 | 1998-09-14 | | Professor Moeran Brian Dermot |
1994-07-10 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1997-09-01 | 2002-09-30 | | Professor Morris Paul James Thomas Francis |
1987-12-16 | 1998-06-30 | | Professor Ngan Henry |
1999-01-14 | 2000-06-20 | | Professor Norton Joseph Jude |
1994-02-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Nunan David Charles |
1982-12-01 | 1994-06-30 | | Professor Ogle Clive William |
1998-08-01 | 1999-07-31 | | Professor Pang Peter Kai To |
1995-09-01 | 2000-08-31 | | Professor Porter Brian |
2003-01-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Smales Frederick Charles |
1998-01-01 | 2002-12-31 | | Professor Smales Frederick Charles |
1993-01-04 | 1994-12-31 | | Professor Spremann Klaus |
1999-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Tambling Jeremy Charles Richard |
2002-02-07 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Tang Siu Wa |
1987-11-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Tatlow Antony Tissington |
1994-05-01 | 2001-07-09 | | Professor Tong David Shuk Yin |
1999-09-22 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Tong Howell |
1997-09-22 | 1999-09-21 | | Professor Tong Howell |
1986-09-01 | 1996-06-30 | | Professor Tricker Robert Ian |
1998-04-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2003-06-04 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1999-01-16 | 2000-01-15 | | Professor Wang Sijing |
1984-09-01 | 1997-09-30 | | Professor Weatherhead Brian |
1987-04-01 | 1999-09-07 | | Professor Wesley-Smith Peter |
1997-10-19 | 1998-07-18 | | Professor White III Lynn Townsend |
2001-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1979-05-01 | 2001-06-30 | | |
1995-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
1995-03-01 | 1997-11-30 | | Professor Wu Pui Chee |
1999-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2003-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2002-02-02 | 2003-06-30 | | |
1997-02-02 | 2002-02-01 | | |
1998-01-01 | 1999-12-31 | | Professor Yang Joseph Chuan Shih |
1993-12-01 | 1997-12-31 | | Professor Yang Joseph Chuan Shih |
1997-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2003-02-01 | 2003-10-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
1998-02-01 | 2003-01-31 | | Professor Young Enoch Chien Ming |
1999-07-01 | 2003-10-31 | | |
2001-02-01 | 2002-07-31 | | Professor Yung Bell |
1998-02-01 | 2001-01-31 | | Professor Yung Bell |
2003-08-18 | 2003-10-31 | | |